The City Of Rochester v. Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The City Of Rochester
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Beretta U.S.A. Corp, Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC, Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms, a/k/a Strassel's Machine, Inc., JA Industries, LLC, f/k/a Jennings Firearms, f/k/a Bryco Arms, f/k/a Jimenez Arms, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, Remarms, LLC a/k/a Remington Firearms, Savage Arms, Inc., Sig Sauer, Inc., Springfield Armory, Inc., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Taurus Holdings, Inc., a/k/a Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc., JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Arm Or Ally, LLC, Brownells, Inc., a/k/a Brownells or Bob Brownell's, GS Performance, LLC, a/k/a Glockstore, a/k/a GSPC, a/k/a Double Diamond, Indie Guns, LLC, JSD Supply, KM Tactical, Polymer80, Inc., Primary Arms, LLC, Ranier Arms, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., a/k/a 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Rock Slide USA, LLC, Bangers, L.P., n/k/a Iron Valley Supply Co., Gun Center Inc., a/k/a GC Wholesale, RSR Group, Inc., Vintage Firearms, LLC, Wolcott Guns Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JA Industries, LLC,, Remarms, LLC, Taurus Holdings, Inc.,, Brownells, Inc.,, GS Performance, LLC,, Gun Center Inc.,, Strassel, Jennings Firearms,, Bryco Arms,, Jimenez Arms, Remington Firearms, Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc., Brownells or Bob Brownell, Glockstore,, Double Diamond, GSPC,, Salvo Technologies, Inc.,, Bangers, L.P., and GC Wholesale
Case Number: 6:2023cv06061
Filed: January 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Stayed. (TF)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' motions to stay (No. 23-CV-66, ECF No. 93; No. 23-CV-6061, ECF No. 94) are GRANTED. This matter is stayed pending the Second Circuit's resolution of National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. v. James, No. 22-1374. Defendants shall notify the Court within seven days of the Second Circuit's decision on the appeal. Defendants' motions to consolidate (ECF No. 23-CV-66, ECF No. 109; No. 23-CV-6061, ECF No. 111) are GRANTED. These actions (No. 23-CV-66 and No. 23-CV-6061) are consolidated for pretrial purposes only. No. 23-CV-6061 is designated as the lead case, and all future filings pertinent to these actions shall be made in No. 23-CV-6061 only. The parties' stipulated submission schedule (No. 23-CV-6061, ECF No. 71) remains in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/8/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #111 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bangers, L.P.,, Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate filed by The City Of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wolcott Guns Inc.. (Chiafullo, Christopher)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Chiafullo on behalf of Wolcott Guns Inc. (Chiafullo, Christopher)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ranier Arms, LLC. (Chiafullo, Christopher)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Chiafullo on behalf of Ranier Arms, LLC (Chiafullo, Christopher)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER re: #111 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Responses due May 29, 2023. Replies due June 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/15/2023. (MFM)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Bangers, L.P.,, Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Allan, Scott)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Charles Lallis on behalf of Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., GS Performance, LLC,, Savage Arms, Inc. (Lallis, Danny)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #94 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings filed by Bangers, L.P.,, Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JSD Supply. (Schechter, Robert)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arm Or Ally, LLC. (Harfenist, Steven)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Polymer80, Inc.. (Sweeney, John)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Fender on behalf of KM Tactical (Fender, Matthew)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bangers, L.P.,. (Allan, Scott)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Charles Allan on behalf of Bangers, L.P., (Allan, Scott)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #94 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by The City Of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Transcript)(Badala, Salvatore)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Harfenist on behalf of Arm Or Ally, LLC (Harfenist, Steven)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Calihan on behalf of Remarms, LLC (Calihan, Robert)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City Of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City Of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The City Of Rochester. (Badala, Salvatore)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Attorney Robert B. Calihan for Remarms, LLC added. Attorney Thomas B. Cronmiller terminated. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/3/2023. (TF)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Matthew Schechter on behalf of JSD Supply (Schechter, Robert)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. No action required re #93 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re Substitution of Counsel: Robert B. Calihan is substituted for Thomas B. Cronmiller. Modified on 3/27/2023 (TF).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Allan, Scott)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER re Substitution of Counsel: Robert B. Calihan is substituted for Thomas B. Cronmiller. (Cronmiller, Thomas) Modified on 3/27/2023 (TF).
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. McFerren on behalf of Taurus Holdings, Inc., (McFerren, William)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Weeks, IV on behalf of Taurus Holdings, Inc., (Weeks, John)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: The applications of Shayna E. Sacks and Salvatore C. Badala to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Plaintiff City of Rochester in this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/16/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: The application of Daniel C. Harkins to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court is GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendant Beretta U.S.A. Corp. in this action. The associated motion to waive the local counsel requirement (ECF No. 83) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/15/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER granting Motions to Waive Local Counsel Requirement as to Shayna E. Sacks and Salvatore C. Badala. ECF Nos. 86-87. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/15/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use MOTION event RE #86 re Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement and #87 re Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. No Action required. (TF)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #54 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Shayna E. Sacks ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4801638.) Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. (Napoli, Paul)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #53 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Salvatore C. Badala ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4801476.) Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement. (Napoli, Paul)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie J. Colopy on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC (Colopy, Katie)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Rice on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC (Rice, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION TO WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL re #82 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Daniel C. Harkins ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4820018.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement for Daniel C. Harkins)(Friedman, Steven)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Daniel C. Harkins ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4820018.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Filing Registration Form)(Friedman, Steven)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: The applications of William C. McFerren and John F. Weeks IV to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendant Taurus Holdings, Inc. in this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/13/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: The applications of Mark D. Sheridan and Keith Bradley to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendant Beretta U.S.A. Corp. in this action. The associated motions to waive the local counsel requirement (ECF Nos. 77, 79) are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/13/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION TO WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL re #78 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Keith Bradley ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4818988.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement for Keith Bradley)(Friedman, Steven)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Keith Bradley ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4818988.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Filing Registration Form)(Friedman, Steven)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION TO WAIVE re #76 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Mark D. Sheridan ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4818782.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement for Mark D. Sheridan)(Friedman, Steven)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Mark D. Sheridan ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4818782.) by Beretta U.S.A. Corp. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Filing Registration Form)(Friedman, Steven)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Summons Issued as to Bangers, L.P., Gun Center Inc., JA Industries, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Summons for JA Ind.; #2 Summons for Gun Center)(TF)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Original Summons Filed. (Napoli, Paul)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Original Summons Filed. (Napoli, Paul)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Original Summons Filed. (Napoli, Paul)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER adopting #66 Stipulation. The time for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended pending this Court's decision on Defendants' forthcoming motion to stay. Defendants will respond to the complaint the later of thirty (30) days after this Court issues a decision denying the motion to stay or, if the motion to stay is granted, thirty (30) days after the Second Circuit Court of Appeals issues its decision in the National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. v. James case. Defendants will file the motion to stay by March 24, 2023, that Plaintiff shall have until April 24, 2023 to file its response in opposition to the motion to stay, and that Defendants shall have until May 8, 2023 to file a reply in further support of the motion to stay.Plaintiff shall have forty-five (45) days from the filing of motions to dismiss the complaint by Defendants to file an amended Complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, it shall have sixty (60) days from the filing of motions to dismiss the complaint by Defendants to file its response in opposition, and that Defendants shall then have thirty (30) days to file replies in further support of the motions to dismiss. By March 7, 2023, all Defendants will notify Plaintiff's counsel: (1) if they were not served with the complaint; (2) any objections to whether the service of the complaint was improper or waive any such objection, and (3) of any errors or corrections to the legal name of the entity in Plaintiff's caption. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (MFM)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER granting #63 #64 MOTIONS TO WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL REQUIREMENT by Taurus Holdings, Inc. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: The applications of Katie J. Colopy and Michael Lyn Rice to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendant Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC in this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ORDER granting #65 Motion to Withdraw for Judith Treger Shelton, Thomas E. Liptak, and Alexander J. Douglas. The Clerk of Court shall terminate those attorneys from this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The applications of Noel J. Francisco, Harry S. Graver, Anthony J. Dick, and Andrew E. Lelling to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendant Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. in this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/7/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Allan, Scott)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 First MOTION to Withdraw for Judith Treger Shelton, Thomas E. Liptak, and Alexander J. Douglas by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc..(Douglas, Alexander)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Motion to waive local counsel event. No action required. #63 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Taurus Holdings, Inc. and #64 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Taurus Holdings, Inc. Clerk to modify description and event. (TF)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION TO WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL by Taurus Holdings, Inc.,. to #60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - William C. McFerren ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4807848.) Notice of Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement - William C. McFerren filed by Taurus Holdings, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement - William C. McFerren)(McCarthy, John) Modified on 3/3/2023 (TF).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION TO WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL by Taurus Holdings, Inc.,. to #59 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - John F. Weeks IV ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4807840.) Notice of Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement - John F. Weeks IV filed by Taurus Holdings, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Waive Local Counsel Requirement - John F. Weeks IV)(McCarthy, John) Modified on 3/3/2023 (TF).
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Katie J. Colopy ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4810874.) by Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Affidavit of K. Martin, #2 Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katie J. Colopy, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Oath, #5 ECF Registration Form, #6 Civility Principles Oath, #7 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Kathleen)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Michale Lyn Rice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4810855.) by Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sponsor Affidavit of K. Martin, #2 Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Lyn Rice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Oath, #5 ECF Registration Form, #6 Civility Principles Oath, #7 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Kathleen)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - William C. McFerren, #59 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - John F. Weeks IV ACTION REQUIRED: As required by L.R. Civ. P. 83.2(a)(1), PHV attorneys are required to obtain local counsel or submit a motion for waiver of that requirement. File appropriate documents using Docketing Event: Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - William C. McFerren ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4807848.) by Taurus Holdings, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Attorney Database and ECF Form)(McCarthy, John)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - John F. Weeks IV ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4807840.) by Taurus Holdings, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Attorney Database and ECF Form)(McCarthy, John)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The applications of David H. Thompson and Brian W. Barnes to be admitted pro hac vice to this Court are GRANTED for the purpose of representing Defendants in this action. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/27/2023. (MFM)Clerk to Follow up
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Nelson Covert on behalf of Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. (Covert, Barry)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #53 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Salvatore C. Badala, #54 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Shayna E. Sacks ACTION REQUIRED: As required by L.R. Civ. P. 83.2(a)(1), PHV attorneys are required to obtain local counsel or submit a motion for waiver of that requirement. File appropriate documents using Docketing Event: Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Martin, Kathleen)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen J. Martin on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC (Martin, Kathleen)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Shayna E. Sacks ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4801638.) by The City Of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Attorneys Oath, #4 Declaration Oath of Office, #5 Supplement ECF registration form)(Napoli, Paul)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Salvatore C. Badala ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4801476.) by The City Of Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Attorneys Oath, #4 Declaration Oath of Office, #5 Supplement ECF registration form)(Napoli, Paul)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KM Tactical. (Goldstein, Philip)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip A. Goldstein on behalf of KM Tactical (Goldstein, Philip)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Polymer80, Inc.. (Nardone, Marc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A Nardone on behalf of Polymer80, Inc. (Nardone, Marc)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter J. Shkolnik on behalf of The City Of Rochester (Shkolnik, Hunter)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of David H. Thompson, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4799035.) by Brownells, Inc.,, Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Attorney Oath, #3 Civility Principles Oath, #4 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #5 Sponsor Affidavit of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Flynn, Terrance)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Brian W. Barnes, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4799007.) by Brownells, Inc.,, Primary Arms, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Attorney Oath, #3 Civility Principles Oath, #4 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #5 Sponsor Affidavit of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Flynn, Terrance)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rock Slide USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sovereign Guns, Inc. for Rock Slide USA, LLC.. (Flynn, Terrance)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Remarms, LLC. (Cronmiller, Thomas)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter filed by RSR Group, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, SCCY Industries, LLC, Glock, Inc., Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., Springfield Armory, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated as to Vintage Firearms, LLC, RSR Group, Inc., Remarms, LLC, GS Performance, LLC,, Hi Point Firearms,, Primary Arms, LLC, Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Taurus Holdings, Inc.,, Indie Guns, LLC, JJE Capital Holdings, LLC, Bangers, L.P.,, JSD Supply, Sig Sauer, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Glock, Inc., Polymer80, Inc., Ranier Arms, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc.,, Beretta U.S.A. Corp, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., Savage Arms, Inc., Springfield Armory, Inc., Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc., Brownells, Inc.,, JA Industries, LLC,, Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., Wolcott Guns Inc., KM Tactical, O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, Arm Or Ally, LLC, Gun Center Inc.,, Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC regarding Local Civil Rule 5.1(e) related cases. (Allan, Scott)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Cronmiller on behalf of Remarms, LLC (Cronmiller, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc... (Brown, Meghan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vintage Firearms, LLC. (Allan, Scott)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. McCarthy, Sr on behalf of Taurus Holdings, Inc., (McCarthy, John)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance P. Flynn on behalf of Rock Slide USA, LLC (Flynn, Terrance)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JJE Capital Holdings, LLC. (Allan, Scott)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Charles Allan on behalf of JJE Capital Holdings, LLC (Allan, Scott)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Friedman on behalf of Beretta U.S.A. Corp (Friedman, Steven)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Salvo Technologies, Inc., identifying Other Affiliate DBH Tides Salvo Holdco, LLC for Salvo Technologies, Inc.,.. (Flynn, Terrance)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Primary Arms, LLC. (Flynn, Terrance)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brownells, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent 2nd Adventure Group, Inc. for Brownells, Inc.,.. (Flynn, Terrance)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Noel J. Francisco ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4790402.) by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Declaration, #5 Supplement)(Douglas, Alexander)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Harry S. Graver ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4790399.) by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Declaration, #5 Supplement)(Douglas, Alexander)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Anthony J. Dick ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4790389.) by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Declaration, #5 Supplement)(Douglas, Alexander)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Andrew E. Lelling ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4790372.) by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Declaration, #5 Supplement)(Douglas, Alexander)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taurus Holdings, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Taurus Armas, S.A. for Taurus Holdings, Inc.,.. (McCarthy, John)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance P. Flynn on behalf of Brownells, Inc.,, Primary Arms, LLC, Salvo Technologies, Inc., (Flynn, Terrance)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sig Sauer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sig Sauer US Holding LP, Corporate Parent L&O Finance GmbH for Sig Sauer, Inc... (Joyce, Robert)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Joyce on behalf of Sig Sauer, Inc. (Joyce, Robert)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beretta U.S.A. Corp identifying Corporate Parent Beretta Holdings S.A. for Beretta U.S.A. Corp.. (Friedman, Steven)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc.. (Pisciotti, Anthony)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc.. (Pisciotti, Anthony)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect pdf. attached re #21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., refiled correctly as #22 . (TF)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSR Group, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Mossberg Corporation for O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated.. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Brown, Meghan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCCY Industries, LLC. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan M. Brown on behalf of Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc. (Brown, Meghan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hi Point Firearms,. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GS Performance, LLC,. (Erdreich, Ryan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L. Erdreich on behalf of Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., GS Performance, LLC,, Savage Arms, Inc. (Erdreich, Ryan)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Savage Arms, Inc.. (Pisciotti, Anthony)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Pisciotti on behalf of Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc., GS Performance, LLC,, Savage Arms, Inc. (Pisciotti, Anthony)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smith & Wesson Inc., Other Affiliate Smith & Wesson Sales Company for Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc... (Douglas, Alexander)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glock, Inc.. (Allan, Scott)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint until 30 days after the Court decides Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/1/23. (TF)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Allan, Scott)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Charles Allan on behalf of Glock, Inc., Hi Point Firearms,, Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc., O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated, RSR Group, Inc., SCCY Industries, LLC, Springfield Armory, Inc. (Allan, Scott)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Pursuant to Local Rule 81(a)(4) (Douglas, Alexander)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal,,, Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Douglas, Alexander)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Civil Cover Sheet has different name than complaint, please file correct civil cover sheet. (TMK)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Primary Arms, LLC, Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Salvo Technologies, Inc., a/k/a 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Brownells, Inc., a/k/a Brownells or Bob Brownell's, KM Tactical, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Wolcott Guns Inc. from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2022010581. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4777661), filed by Primary Arms, LLC, Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Salvo Technologies, Inc., a/k/a 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co., Brownells, Inc., a/k/a Brownells or Bob Brownell's, KM Tactical, Rock Slide USA, LLC, Wolcott Guns Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A-T (State Court Filings), #4 Exhibit U-KK (Consent Forms))(Douglas, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City Of Rochester v. Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City Of Rochester
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Salvatore C. Badala
Represented By: Shayna E. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Andrew E. Lelling
Represented By: Anthony J. Dick
Represented By: Harry S. Graver
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Represented By: Barry Nelson Covert
Represented By: Noel J. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beretta U.S.A. Corp
Represented By: Steven A. Friedman
Represented By: Mark D. Sheridan
Represented By: Daniel C. Harkins
Represented By: Keith Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bushmaster Firearms Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt's Manufacturing Company, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen J. Martin
Represented By: Katie J. Colopy
Represented By: Michael L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi Point Firearms, a/k/a Strassel's Machine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA Industries, LLC, f/k/a Jennings Firearms, f/k/a Bryco Arms, f/k/a Jimenez Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kel-Tec CNC Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.F. Mossberg & Sons, Incorporated
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remarms, LLC a/k/a Remington Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage Arms, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Armory, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Meghan M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCCY Industries, LLC
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus Holdings, Inc., a/k/a Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJE Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arm Or Ally, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells, Inc., a/k/a Brownells or Bob Brownell's
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Performance, LLC, a/k/a Glockstore, a/k/a GSPC, a/k/a Double Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indie Guns, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSD Supply
Represented By: Peter H. Tilem
Represented By: Robert Matthew Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KM Tactical
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Represented By: Matthew D Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polymer80, Inc.
Represented By: Connor M. Blair
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Arms, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranier Arms, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Chiafullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvo Technologies, Inc., a/k/a 80P Builder or 80P Freedom Co.
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Slide USA, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bangers, L.P., n/k/a Iron Valley Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gun Center Inc., a/k/a GC Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSR Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Firearms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolcott Guns Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Represented By: Christopher M. Chiafullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi Point Firearms,
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA Industries, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remarms, LLC
Represented By: Thomas B. Cronmiller
Represented By: Robert B. Calihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus Holdings, Inc.,
Represented By: John G. McCarthy, Sr.
Represented By: John F. Weeks, IV
Represented By: John F. Weeks IV
Represented By: William C. McFerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells, Inc.,
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Performance, LLC,
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gun Center Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strassel
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Firearms,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryco Arms,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimenez Arms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Firearms
Represented By: Thomas B. Cronmiller
Represented By: Robert B. Calihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus International Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: John G. McCarthy, Sr.
Represented By: John F. Weeks, IV
Represented By: John F. Weeks IV
Represented By: William C. McFerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownells or Bob Brownell
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glockstore,
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Diamond
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSPC,
Represented By: Anthony M. Pisciotti
Represented By: Ryan L. Erdreich
Represented By: Danny Charles Lallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvo Technologies, Inc.,
Represented By: Alexander Jerome Douglas
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Represented By: Thomas E. Liptak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bangers, L.P.,
Represented By: Scott Charles Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?