Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Brenda F. Thomas
Case Number: 6:2023cv06339
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191 Bank Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Brenda F. Thomas served on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Falasco, Todd)
June 22, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Brenda F. Thomas. (TMK)
June 22, 2023 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
June 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
June 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Freedom Mortgage Corporation cert of merit (Falasco, Todd)
June 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Falasco, Todd)
June 21, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Falasco, Todd)
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brenda F. Thomas $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4904722, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falasco, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Todd Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda F. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?