Yannello et al v. SSA Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Alyssa Yannello, Katie Mort, Brent Spooner, Denise Wells, Kuron Parker, Tensa Ndongwa, Micheal Simpson, Daniel LaMay, Anna Rissew, Eleni Papachatzis, Alexa VanDam, Zoe Corato and Oceanique Brown
Defendant: SSA Group, LLC and SSA Group New York
Case Number: 6:2023cv06452
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Oceanique Brown. (Pechman, Louis)
September 20, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Zoe Corato. (Pechman, Louis)
September 20, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Alexa VanDam. (Pechman, Louis)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Eleni Papachatzis. (Pechman, Louis)
September 5, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Anna Rissew. (Pechman, Louis)
September 1, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Daniel LaMay. (Pechman, Louis)
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Micheal Simpson. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Tensa Ndongwa. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Kuron Parker. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Denise Wells. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Brent Spooner. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Katie Mort. (Pechman, Louis)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Louis Pechman on behalf of Alyssa Yannello. (Pechman, Louis)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SSA Group, LLC. (LMD)
August 11, 2023 Notification to Chambers of online Civil Case Opening to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. (LMD)
August 11, 2023 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LMD)
August 11, 2023 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gianfranco J. Cuadra on behalf of Katie Mort, Alyssa Yannello (Cuadra, Gianfranco)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Pechman, Louis)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SSA Group, LLC $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4946761, filed by Alyssa Yannello, Katie Mort. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pechman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yannello et al v. SSA Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Group New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Yannello
Represented By: Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Mort
Represented By: Gianfranco J. Cuadra
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Spooner
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wells
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuron Parker
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tensa Ndongwa
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Simpson
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel LaMay
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Rissew
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleni Papachatzis
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa VanDam
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe Corato
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceanique Brown
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?