Krenzer v. Wilkins et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Krenzer
Defendant: Kyle Wilkins, Finger Lakes Railway Corporation, Charles Vaas, Richard Canino, Investigator Christopher Bonham and ADA Peter Van Dellon
Case Number: 6:2024cv06007
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Bonham, Richard Canino, Finger Lakes Railway Corporation, Charles Vaas, ADA Peter Van Dellon, Kyle Wilkins, filed by Theresa Krenzer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (DMK)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of MANUAL FILING thumb drive #2 by Theresa Krenzer re #10 Amended Complaint. (DMK)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #8 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/24/2024. (MJK)This was mailed to: Plaintiff.
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk striken Docket Nos. 1 (Complaint), 4 (Memorandum in Support), and 5 (Exhibits) and to return those documents to Theresa Krenzer. Clerk also mailed copies of ECF #4,8,13 from case 22-CV-6440 per #6 Order to Theresa Krenzer. (DMK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Class by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action will be dismissed, unless within thirty (30) days Plaintiff pays the filing fee and files a new complaint that complies with Rules 8 and 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's instructions. The Clerk is directed to strike Docket Nos. 1 (Complaint), 4 (Memorandum in Support), and 5 (Exhibits) and to return those documents to Krenzer. The Court is herewith mailing copies of ECF Nos. 4, 8, and 13, from case number 22-CV-6440, Fisher v. ATF, to Plaintiff for reasons explained in the Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/23/2024. (MJK)This was mailed to: Plaintiff.Clerk to Follow up
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STRIKEN per #6 Order entered 1/23/2024. EXHIBITS by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK) Modified on 1/25/2024 (DMK).
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STRIKEN per #6 Order entered 1/23/2024. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Complaint by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK) Modified on 1/25/2024 (DMK).
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa for all further proceedings. Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/5/2024. (MDS)Clerk to Follow up
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Hon. Charles J. Siragusa added. Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (DMK)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of MANUAL FILING of thumb drive by Theresa Krenzer re #1 Complaint. File in Clerk's Office. (DMK) (DMK).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theresa Krenzer. (DMK)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Bonham, Richard Canino, Finger Lakes Railway Corporation, Charles Vaas, ADA Peter Van Dellon, Kyle Wilkins, filed by Theresa Krenzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DMK)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, ADR Notification and pro se assistance program info given to plaintiff at the counter. (DMK)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, ADR Notification and pro se assistance program info given to plaintiff at the counter. (DMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krenzer v. Wilkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Krenzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finger Lakes Railway Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Vaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Canino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Christopher Bonham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Peter Van Dellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?