Ofray v. City of Rochester et al
Defendant: City of Rochester, Rochester Police Department, RPD Officer Mitchell Leach and Officer Mitchell Leach
Petitioner: Jasmine Ofray
Case Number: 6:2024cv06170
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 5/1/24. (RE)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Rochester, Mitchell Leach, Rochester Police Department.(Noone, Christopher)
April 16, 2024 E-Filing Notification: #11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Summons Returned Executed event. No action required. (RE)
April 16, 2024 SUMMONS Returned Executed #11 City of Rochester served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024; Mitchell Leach served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024; Rochester Police Department served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (RE)
April 16, 2024 E-Filing Notification: #11 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Clerk corrected scan to view right side up. In future, please attached scan in proper format. (RE)
April 12, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Verified Complaint served on RPD/Ofc. Leach/City of Rochester on 4-12-2024, filed by Jasmine Ofray. (Young, Mark) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/16/2024) (RE).
March 28, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mitchell Leach. (TMK)
March 28, 2024 Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint summons-RPD Ofc. Mitchell Leach. (Young, Mark)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to City of Rochester, Rochester Police Department. (TMK)
March 28, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
March 28, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov.' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
March 28, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Fed summons all def.. (Young, Mark)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Mark)
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Summons-all parties separate. (Young, Mark)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #2 Continuation of Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Mark)
March 26, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER to Show Cause why this case should not be stricken for failure to submit the Civil Cover Sheet as required by Local Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 3. The deadline to respond to this Order to Show Cause is April 25, 2024. Failure to comply with this order will result in this case being stricken from the court docket. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/26/2024.(CAL)
March 22, 2024 E-Filing Notification: #2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Mark) ACTION REQUIRED: filing Attorney is directed to file a completed civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. Summonses for issuance please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (DMK)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, Mark)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5133951, filed by Jasmine Ofray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Mark)
March 20, 2024 E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT filing Attorney is directed to file a completed civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. Summonses for issuance please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ofray v. City of Rochester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jasmine Ofray
Represented By: Mark A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester
Represented By: Christopher Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Police Department
Represented By: Christopher Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPD Officer Mitchell Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mitchell Leach
Represented By: Christopher Noone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?