Handy v. Paychex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dylan Handy
Defendant: Paychex, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv06206
Filed: April 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S CROSS MOTION TO REMAND filed by Paychex, Inc. (Jones, Stephen)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its reply in further support of its motion to dismiss on or before May 29, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/15/2024. (CAL)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Paychex, Inc. (Jones, Stephen)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Cross-Motion to Remand filed by Dylan Handy. (Corbett, Jonathan)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W Corbett on behalf of Dylan Handy. (Corbett, Jonathan)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. At Plaintiff's request, and with the consent of Defendant, the 5 scheduling order on #4 motion to dismiss is amended as follows: responses are due on or before May 13, 2024; replies are due on or before May 20, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/19/2024. (CAL) (Copy of this text order has been sent to attorney Jonathan Corbett, Esq. by email).
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark : Clerk Mailed Copy of Text Order to Charlotte Kaysen. (DAF)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marian W. Payson for all pre-trial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/18/24. (JHF)This was mailed to: Charlotte Kaysen, Esq., Corbett Rights, P.C., 5 Union Square West, Suite 1461, New York, NY 10003.
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paychex, Inc. re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Lingle, Michael)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re: #4 Motion to Dismiss. Responses are due on or before May 9, 2024. Replies are due on or before May 16, 2024. Upon review of the papers, the Court will determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. Otherwise, the matter will be deemed submitted and decided on the papers. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case by the assigned magistrate judge. In particular, the parties may consent to have just the pending motion to dismiss resolved by the assigned magistrate judge, in which case the motion will likely be resolved sooner than if it is handled by the undersigned. Consent forms may be found on the Court's website at https://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/forms-3. No adverse substantive consequences will result should the parties choose not to consent. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/18/2024. (CAL)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark : Clerk Mailed Copy of Text Order to Charlotte Kaysen. (DAF)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Paychex, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Jones, Stephen)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lingle on behalf of Paychex, Inc. (Lingle, Michael)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paychex, Inc. (Jones, Stephen)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov.' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paychex, Inc. from New York State Supreme Court, Monroe County, case number E2024003479. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5149858), filed by Paychex, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Document List, #4 Exhibit B-1 - Summons & Complaint, #5 Exhibit B-2 - Summons & Complaint (Fee Previously Paid), #6 Exhibit B-3 - Affirmation/Affidavit of Service)(Jones, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. Paychex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Handy
Represented By: Jonathan W Corbett
Represented By: Charlotte Kaysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paychex, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Jones
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?