Hamilton County Emergency Communications District v. Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Plaintiff: Hamilton County Emergency Communications District
Defendant: Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00330
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 MEMORANDUM: The Court will GRANT both of BellSouth's motions for summary judgment (Court File Nos. 152, 256) and DENY the Districts' second motion for partial summary judgment (Court File No. 248). AN APPROPRIATE ORDER WILL ENTER.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/5/2016. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-00330-CLC-SKL et al.(aws, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER finding as moot 163 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/14/13. (GRE, )
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER finding as moot 63 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 69 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 73 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 76 Motion for Order to Show Cause; finding as moot 77 Motion for Order to Show Cause; finding as moot 86 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 1/22/13. (GRE, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/19/12. (JLMc, )
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM with order to follow;Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/20/2012. (AWH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton County Emergency Communications District v. Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton County Emergency Communications District
Represented By: Thomas Clifton Greenholtz
Represented By: Yousef A Hamadeh
Represented By: Frederick L Hitchcock
Represented By: Michael J Mahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Breslin
Represented By: Robert G Norred, Jr
Represented By: James Henry Walker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?