Richard A Green v. Robert Jon Green et al
Plaintiff: Richard A Green
Defendant: Robert Jon Green, The Trusts of Cynthia J Leui Green, Alix C Michel, William C Carriger, Wayne E Thomas, T Maxfield Bahner, Lisa K Molhusen, David L Ruhling, W Roger Fitch, Lonnie D Leui, Erin Leui Santori, Kimberly A Leui Kovach, Kerry D Leui, Christiane S Leui, Does, Chamblisis, Bahner & Stophel, P.C., Michael D Oxtentenko, James D Purple, Waldemar Kutzner and Eppy Hasso Green
Case Number: 1:2014cv00043
Filed: February 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING 167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . There being no remaining issues, the Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE the case. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/7/2015. (AML, ) Copy of Memo/Judgment Order served to Richard Green via US Mail.
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM. The Court will GRANT the motions to dismiss filed by Defendants and will also GRANT Chambliss Defendants' motion for summary judgment. An Order Shall Enter. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/16/2015. (AML, )
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Andrew Wright is terminated as counsel of record and Attorney Whitt is substituted in his place as counsel of record for Defendant Fitch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/1/2014. (BJL, ) Modified on 5/1/2014 (BJL, ).***Mailed to Attorney J Andrew Wright and to Pro Se Plaintiff Richard A Green.
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rinat Klier-Erlich terminated; denying as moot 112 Motion to deem motion for admission pro hac vice moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Rinat Klier-Erlich w ith the law firm Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP as counsel of record. Further, the Show Cause hearing as to Attorney Rinat Klier-Erlich scheduled for April 24, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. [EASTERN] is hereby CANCELLED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 4/23/2014. (BJL, )Mailed to Attorneys Rinat Klier, J. Andrew Wright, Mario H. Alfaro, Jr. and to Pro Se Plaintiff Richard Green.
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Efren Anthony Compean terminated; granting 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys B. Hart Knight and H. Rowan Leathers III have been added for defendant Ruhling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 4/7/2014. (SAC, ) Modified on 4/8/2014, Order has been mailed to Attorney Compean, Wright, Alfaro, Green and Erlich. (SAC, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard A Green v. Robert Jon Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jon Green
Represented By: Mi Wu Belvin
Represented By: Nathaniel S Goggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trusts of Cynthia J Leui Green
Represented By: Mario H Alfaro, Jr
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alix C Michel
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Carriger
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E Thomas
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Maxfield Bahner
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa K Molhusen
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Ruhling
Represented By: Efren Anthony Compean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Roger Fitch
Represented By: J Andrew Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie D Leui
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Leui Santori
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Leui Kovach
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry D Leui
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiane S Leui
Represented By: J Christopher Clem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamblisis, Bahner & Stophel, P.C.
Represented By: Arthur P Brock
Represented By: Leslie T Foster
Represented By: Tom Greenholtz
Represented By: William R Hannah
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Oxtentenko
Represented By: Mi Wu Belvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Purple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldemar Kutzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eppy Hasso Green
Represented By: Mi Wu Belvin
Represented By: Nathaniel S Goggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?