Lee v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company et al (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Mary Lee
Defendant: William Evans, Larry George, AXA Financial, Inc. and AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00140
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Filing 11 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel as to David Paul Coates re #7 Supplement and #8 Supplement. (aws, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company, William Evans, Larry George. (Attachments: #1 Summons Larry George, #2 Summons Will Evans)(aws, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to AXA Financial, Inc. (aws, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Mary Lee. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Coates, David)
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Mary Lee. (Coates, David)
July 9, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND Administrative Notice to Counsel David P. Coates re #1 Complaint : requirements due by 7/16/2018. (aws, )
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/28/18. (GRE, )
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/28/18. (GRE, )
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/28/18. (GRE, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : requirements due by 7/3/2018. (GRE, )
June 28, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (GRE, )
June 28, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3704114.), filed by Mary Lee.(Coates, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee
Represented By: David Paul Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?