Cunningham v. UNUM Group et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Scott Cunningham
Defendant: UNUM Group, John F. McGarry, Daniel J. Waxenberg and Richard P. McKenney
Case Number: 1:2018cv00154
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
2 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on August 17, 2018. (JAN, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Upon the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond [Doc. 23 in 1:18- cv-128; Doc. 17 in 1:18-cv-154; Doc. 15 in 1:18-cv-169], and for good cause shown, it is hereby Ordered as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/16/2018. (BJL, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Case Nos. 1:18-cv-128 and 1:18-cv-169. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the three cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to Chief District Judge Thomas A. Varlan, and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered at this time. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/16/18. (Steger, Christopher)
August 15, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by John F. McGarry, Richard P. McKenney, UNUM Group, Daniel J. Waxenberg. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Williams, James)
August 9, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Cunningham. Daniel J. Waxenberg served on 7/30/2018. (Bramlett, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Cunningham. John F. McGarry served on 7/30/2018. (Bramlett, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Cunningham. Richard P. McKenney served on 7/30/2018. (Bramlett, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Cunningham. UNUM Group served on 7/30/2018. (Bramlett, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeremy A. Lieberman on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Cunningham. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/31/2018. (KRS, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Alexander Hood II on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Cunningham. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/31/2018. (KRS, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick V. Dahlstrom on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Cunningham. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/31/2018. (KRS, )
July 27, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney PATRICK DAHLSTROM; #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. ALEXANDER HOOD II ; #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy A. Lieberman, filed by Scott Cunningham (BJL, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy A. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3727954.) by Scott Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bramlett, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. ALEXANDER HOOD II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3727944.) by Scott Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bramlett, Paul)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney PATRICK DAHLSTROM ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3727921.) by Scott Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing)(Bramlett, Paul)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/13/2018. (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/13/2018. (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/13/2018. (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to UNUM Group,Richard P. McKenney,John F. McGarry, Daniel J. Waxenberg. (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (SAC, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3717288.), filed by Scott Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott Cunningham, #2 Exhibit Schedule of Purchases, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Summons-Unum Group, #5 Other Summons-McKenney, #6 Other Summons-McGarry, #7 Other Summons-Waxenberg)(Bramlett, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. UNUM Group et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Group
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. McGarry
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Waxenberg
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P. McKenney
Represented By: James T Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Cunningham
Represented By: Patrick V. Dahlstrom
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Robert Preston Bramlett
Represented By: Paul K Bramlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?