Massey v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Verrina Massey
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc., Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. and Family Dollar Store
Case Number: 1:2018cv00156
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION AND MEDICAL RECORDS IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIPAA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/7/2018. (BDG, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2018 10:00 AM in Judges' Chambers before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. (KRS, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/4/2018. (JCK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Produce RELEASE AND PRODUCTION OF PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION AND MEDICAL RECORDS IN ACCORDANCE WITH HIPAA by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gomez, Erin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Gomez, Erin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Verrina Massey Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures on Defendant (Cardwell, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. The expected length of trial is two (2) days., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 AM, Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2019., Utilization of Mediation due by 4/9/2019. Status Report due by 2/5/2019. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/30/2018. (JCK, )
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendants Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc. and Family Dollar Store, 3251 Rossville Blvd, Chattanooga, TN 37407 [Doc. 12]. The motion is GRANTED. Defendants Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc. and Family Dollar Store, 3251 Rossville Blvd, Chattanooga, TN 37407 are DISMISSED from this case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/29/2018. (JCK)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Family Dollar Stores of TN, Inc. and Family Dollar Store, 3251 Rossville Blvd., Chattanooga by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gomez, Erin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gomez, Erin)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael S. Shawn Cardwell on behalf of Verrina Massey. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 07/24/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 7/24/2018 (BDG, ). Attorney Michael notified via email.
July 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Verrina Massey as to Verrina Massey. (BDG, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Verrina Massey. (BDG, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Gomez, Erin)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 DISREGARD FILING [See #8 Correct ANSWER to Complaint for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.] (Gomez, Erin) Modified on 7/20/2018 (BJL,).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael Cardwell) (AMP)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael Cardwell) (AMP)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael Cardwell) (AMP)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Michael Cardwell is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Michael Cardwell) (AMP)
July 16, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Gomez, Erin)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 18C649. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3717688), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pre-Litigation Settlement Demand, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Gomez, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Erin E Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Erin E Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Store
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Erin E Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verrina Massey
Represented By: Michael S Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?