Newton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Plaintiff: Theresa G. Newton
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00185
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Bradley
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of the parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Callaway, Gregory)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BDG, )
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy on 9/20/2018. (BDG, )
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/13/18. (CMH)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Party. The parties have filed a joint Motion to substitute Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. in the place of Walmart, Inc. as the proper defendant in this lawsuit. For good cause shown, the motion to substitute [Doc. 8] is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the claims against Walmart, Inc. shall be dismissed without prejudice, and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. shall be substituted as the sole defendant in this case. The parties and the Clerk's office shall change the caption of the case to reflect this substitution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/24/18. (Steger, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Filed in error. Please disregard this entry. ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/23/2018. (CMH, ) Modified on 8/23/2018 (GRE, ).
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party defendant to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Callaway, Gregory)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/20/2018. (CMH)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, )
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, )
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/13/2018. (BJL, )
August 9, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL, )
August 9, 2018 Added Corporate Parents/Affiliates to Walmart, Inc (Role - dft): War-Mart Stores East, L.P. WSE Management, LLC; WSE Investment, LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, East, LLC pursuant to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest. (BJL,) Modified on 8/13/2018 (BJL, ).
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bradley County, case number V-18-382. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3740071), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa G. Newton
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?