Teasley v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: R. Kenneth Teasley
Defendant: Jesse Riggins and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00193
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/17/18. (ABF)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/4/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/17/18. (ABF)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by CSX Transportation, Inc., Jesse Riggins (Baker, John)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc., Jesse Riggins.(Baker, John)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/20/2018. (AML, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX Transportation, Inc., Jesse Riggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc., Jesse Riggins (Baker, John)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/22/18. (aws, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/22/18. (aws, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/22/18. (aws, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Riggins)(aws, )
August 22, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (aws, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3750116.), filed by R. Kenneth Teasley. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to CSX, #3 Summons Summons to J. Riggins)(Colvin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teasley v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Riggins
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Kenneth Teasley
Represented By: William G Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?