Tucker v. Transworld Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kirsten Tucker
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00223
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kirsten Tucker. Transworld Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2018. (Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/24/2018. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/24/2018. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/24/2018. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Transworld Systems, Inc. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Transworld Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3775229.), filed by Kirsten Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bennecoff Ginsburg, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Transworld Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Tucker
Represented By: Amy L Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?