Lively et al v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (PLR2)
Plaintiff: James Lively and Elizabeth Lively
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00239
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Liability Insurance)(Albritton, Barret)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (England, Zachary)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Disclosure Statement by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Albritton, Barret)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L. Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 10/17/18. (ADA)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 notice of consent/non-consent) (DJH, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC.(Albritton, Barret)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/09/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Martha Burgett) (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/09/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Martha Burgett) (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/09/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Martha Burgett) (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Attorney Martha Burgett is not registered for CM/ECF. Requirements due by 10/15/2018. (Copy of Notice mailed to Martha Burgett) (AMP)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 18C1012. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3788503), filed by Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Filings, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Notice of Removal)(Albritton, Barret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lively et al v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lively
Represented By: Zachary England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lively
Represented By: Zachary England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Martha Crowder Burgett
Represented By: Barret S Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?