Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority
Case Number: 1:2018cv00254
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-20-18. (KMG, )
November 20, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (BJL, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3821433.) by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Mark)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-14-18. (KMG, ) Modified on 11/14/2018 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney James A. Byram, Jr
November 13, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /Richard E. Glaze, Jr. Treatment Authority and #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /James A. Byram, Jr. filed by Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority . (BJL, )
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /Richard E. Glaze, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3815258.), #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /James A. Byram, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3815259.) (Glaze, Richard)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /James A. Byram, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3815259.) by Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Glaze, Richard)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /Richard E. Glaze, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3815258.) by Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Glaze, Richard)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority waiver sent on 11/7/2018. (Martin, Mark)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority. (BJL, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, CIvil Cover Sheet by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/29/18. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/29/18. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/29/18. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Mark E Martin re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 11/13/2018. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Elizabeth A Alexander re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 11/5/2018. (aws, )
October 29, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (aws, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3803945.), filed by Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit)(Alexander, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Wastewater Treatment Authority
Represented By: Richard E. Glaze, Jr.
Represented By: James A Byram, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A Alexander
Represented By: Mark E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?