Hayduk v. Burke et al (JRG1)

In Re: Philip Craig Burke and Nekolia Swope Burke
Appellant: Andrea D. Hayduk
Appellee: Trevor A. Burke, Taylor N. Burke, Chaffin B. Burke, Trevor Fielding Atchley and Samples, Jennings, Clem & Fields, PLLC
Interested Party: Nicholas W. Whittenburg
Case Number: 1:2018cv00267
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: J Ronnie Greer
1 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/2018. (SAC, )
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/2018. (SAC, )
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/12/2018. (SAC, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chaffin B. Burke, Taylor N. Burke, Trevor A. Burke. (Ray, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Ray on behalf of Chaffin B. Burke, Taylor N. Burke, Trevor A. Burke (Ray, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Motion to Dismiss, Order Dismissing and Memorandum re: Motion to Dismiss)(SAC, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC to all counsel regarding Bankruptcy Rule 8018(a) briefing. (AML, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:15-bk-10724, filed by Andrea D. Hayduk. Appeal Record due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order)(AML, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayduk v. Burke et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Philip Craig Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Nekolia Swope Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrea D. Hayduk
Represented By: Jerrold D Farinash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trevor A. Burke
Represented By: Thomas E Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Taylor N. Burke
Represented By: Thomas E Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chaffin B. Burke
Represented By: Thomas E Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trevor Fielding Atchley
Represented By: Harry R Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Samples, Jennings, Clem & Fields, PLLC
Represented By: James A Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nicholas W. Whittenburg
Represented By: Appeal Whittenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?