United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority, v. A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee et al.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, and United States of America
Defendant: A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee and Nellie Mae Carter
Case Number: 1:2018cv00283
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service, #17 Certificate of Service : requirements due by 1/14/2019. (AML, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 ... disregard filing/wrong case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James) Modified on 1/7/2019 to reflect that filing party informed clerk that they inadvertently filed this doc in wrong case (JAN, ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by United States of America re #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Nellie Mae Carter (Chase, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Description, #2 Exhibit Map)(Chase, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Nellie Mae Carter. (Townsend, C)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by C Crews Townsend on behalf of Nellie Mae Carter (Townsend, C)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF POSSESSION. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/2018. (AML, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry S. Mattice, Jr., United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and the Rules of this Court, are REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/4/18. (ABF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America. (Chase, James)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Memorandum in Support (non-motion) : requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Chase, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Chase, James)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/21/2018. (BJL, )
November 21, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee, Nellie Mae Carter.. (BJL, )
November 20, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee, Nellie Mae Carter, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James) Modified on 11/20/2018 (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority, v. A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA upon the relation and for the use of the TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY,
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Temporary Right To Enter Upon Land In Hamilton County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie Mae Carter
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Roger W Dickson
Represented By: C Crews Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?