Smith v. Otis Elevator Company (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Darrell P Smith
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00292
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vague, Amie)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Michael Nelson on behalf of Darrell P Smith (Nelson, Derek)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melody H. Eagan on behalf of Otis Elevator Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/14/2018. (KRS, ) Regenerated and emailed to Melody Eagan
December 14, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Otis Elevator Company (AML, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave for Melody Eagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90\ paid, receipt no. C1016223) by Otis Elevator Company. (AML, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/2/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/6/18. (ABF)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Otis Elevator Company. (Vague, Amie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Otis Elevator Company.(Vague, Amie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal (Civil Cover Sheet) by Otis Elevator Company. (Vague, Amie)
December 3, 2018 Documents 3-6 mailed to Melody H. Eagan. (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/18. (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/18. (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/18. (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Melody H. Eagan (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal (GRE, )
December 3, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County, case number 18C1193. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3829034), filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vague, Amie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Otis Elevator Company (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell P Smith
Represented By: Derek Michael Nelson
Represented By: C Mark Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Represented By: Amie A Vague
Represented By: Melody H. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?