Lethco et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Brandon W. Lethco and Treasure S. Lethco
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00303
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/4/2019. (AML, )
February 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 2/1/2019. Scheduling conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 1/22/2019. (CAT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bibb, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company (Bibb, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (JCK, )
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2018. (BJL, )
December 13, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Clark, Ryan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0649-3838854 (BJL, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn County Circuit Court, case number 18-CV-371. (Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0649-3838854), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - demand letter)(Bibb, John) Modified on 12/13/2018 to add filing fee amount and receipt (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lethco et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon W. Lethco
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Jay E Kohlbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treasure S. Lethco
Represented By: Beecher A Bartlett, Jr
Represented By: Jay E Kohlbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?