Hymes v. Circle K Stores, Inc. et al (TWP1)

Plaintiff: Renee Hymes
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00306
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Non-Consent) (BDG, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Circle K Stores, Inc..(Martin, Sean)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 12/14/2018. (JCK)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 12/14/2018. (JCK)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 12/14/2018. (JCK)
December 14, 2018 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Circle K Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alimentation Couche-Tard, Inc. for Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hamilton County, case number 18-C-1201. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3840065), filed by Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Criminal Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hymes v. Circle K Stores, Inc. et al (TWP1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Hymes
Represented By: J Taylor Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Derek Wayne Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?