McBryar v. Wacker Chemical Corporation et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Bruce Randall McBryar
Defendant: Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC and Wacker Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00307
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wacker Chemical Corporation, Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC (Greene, Zachary)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal,Heith Frost terminated and Substitution of Counsel Jenna Fullerton . (Greene, Zachary) Modified on 2/11/2019, to update docket text. (SAC, ).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for TUESDAY, JULY 7, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Knoxville, Tennessee in Courtroom 3C. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on January 24, 2019. (AYB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Wacker Chemical Corporation, Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC.(Frost, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Greene, Zachary)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/17/2018. (CAT)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/17/2018. (CAT)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/17/2018. (CAT)
December 17, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wacker Chemical Corporation for Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC. (Frost, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wacker Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Wacker Chemicals Finance B.V. for Wacker Chemical Corporation. (Frost, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley County Circuit Court, case number V18633. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3840243), filed by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC, Wacker Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings filed in Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - docket sheet from Circuit Court, #3 Other Civil cover sheet)(Frost, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBryar v. Wacker Chemical Corporation et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Randall McBryar
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Jenna W Fullerton
Represented By: Zachary H Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacker Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Jenna W Fullerton
Represented By: Zachary H Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?