United States of America v. Weekly Fig, LLC

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Weekly Fig, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
2 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 21:601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Anderson, M)
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/2/2019. (Court Reporter Shannan Andrews) (SAC, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (McClanahan, Leah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by United States of America re #21 Reply to Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Knox News Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Miller's Farm Response, #3 Exhibit 3 - Miller's Farm Order)(Anderson, M)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY TO RESPONSE re #15 Response (Reply in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum). (Anderson, M)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Weekly Fig, LLC c/o Nate Wilson on 3/4/19 by United States of America. (aws, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Weekly Fig, LLC c/o Anju Wilson on 3/4/19 by United States of America. (aws, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Weekly Fig, LLC on 2/27/19 by United States of America. (aws, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (aws, ) Mailed to Weekly Fig, Michele Reneau.
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Weekly Fig, LLC. (aws, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony filed by United States of America. (aws, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Weekly Fig, LLC. (aws, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/18/19. (aws, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the Honorable Susan K. Lee, United States Magistrate Judge, has recused herself in this cause. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge, to handle any matters routinely considered by a magistrate judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/15/19. (ABF)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/14/2019. (KRS, ) Modified on 3/15/2019 per chambers (CNC, ).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/14/2019. (KRS, ) Modified on 3/15/2019 per chambers (CNC, ).
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Respondent Weekly Fig, LLC, appear before the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, Chattanooga Division, for a hearing to commence, presided over by the undersigned in the United States Courthouse, Third Floor District Courtroom, 900 Georgia Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee on April 2, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. EDT to show cause why it should not be compelled to obey the Food Safety Inspection Services subpoena duces tecum issued on October 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/8/19. (aws, ) Modified on 2/11/2019 Mailed to Weekly Fig, LLC. (aws, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/07/2019. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/07/2019. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions - Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/07/2019. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Weekly Fig, LLC. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (KMK, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT (Summons to Issue from Clerk) by United States of America. (Anderson, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT (Civil Cover Sheet) by United States of America. (Anderson, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Marshall K. Williams) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Background Information, #2 Exhibit Secy State, #3 Exhibit Founders, #4 Exhibit Correspondence, #5 Exhibit June Subpoena, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Letter 6-2018, #8 Exhibit Letter 11-2018)(Anderson, M)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Perpetuate Testimony of /Inspection of Premises/Production of Documents., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Anderson, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Weekly Fig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Leah Walker McClanahan
Represented By: M Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Weekly Fig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?