Gouge v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry Gouge
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00032
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by CSX Transportation, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Rule 26(A)(1)(A) Disclosures (Baker, John)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/31/2019. (AML)
May 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2019. Scheduling conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2019 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. (KRS)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO PRODUCE HOSPITAL and MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/3/19. (AWS)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Produce Hospital and Medical Records by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baker, John)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 04/29/2019. (CAT)
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate submitted by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Baker, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Baker, John)
April 4, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by CSX Transportation, Inc. (AML, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 04/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc..(Baker, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Baker, Jr on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Baker, John)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [Doc. 15] serviced by Chambers' Staff upon Attorneys Armbruster & Blotevogel at the e-mail addresses as listed in Doc. 7 at Page ID # 11 and Doc. 8 at Page ID # 13. (KRS, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is ORDERED that, Attorneys Charles W. Armbruster and Michael T. Blotevogel shall register to file and receive future pleadings electronically within TWO DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/27/19. (aws, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on CSX Transportation, Inc. on 03-14-2019, filed by Larry Gouge. (Gritton, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert P. Gritton on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Gouge. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/04/2019. (KRS, )
February 28, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert P. Gritton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3904376.) filed by Larry Gouge (AML, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert P. Gritton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3904376.) by Larry Gouge. (Gritton, Robert)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. Mailed to Attorney Robert Gritton. (AML, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T. Blotevogel on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Gouge. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/25/2019. (KRS, ) Regenerated to Attorney Gouge via email on 2/26
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles W. Armbruster III on behalf of Plaintiff Larry Gouge. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/25/2019. (KRS, ) Regenerated to Attorney Armbruster via email on 2/26/19
February 21, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Armbruster ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3897784.) filed by Larry Gouge, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Blotevogel ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3897801.) filed by Larry Gouge (AML, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Blotevogel ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3897801.) by Larry Gouge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gritton, Robert)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Armbruster ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3897784.) by Larry Gouge. (Gritton, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/8/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorneys Armbruster and Blotevogel.
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/8/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorneys Armbruster and Blotevogel.
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 2/8/2019. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorneys Armbruster and Blotevogel.
February 8, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (AML, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Armbruster and Attorney Blotevogel. Notification mailed to both Attorneys. (AML, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Robert Gritton: Attorney notified via phone that filing fee was received but missing PHV motion and current Certificate of Good Standing. Attorney will forward those documents to Clerk's Office. (AML, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt no.C1016371), filed by Larry Gouge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(AML, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gouge v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Gouge
Represented By: Robert P Gritton
Represented By: Michael T Blotevogel
Represented By: Charles W. Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: John W Baker, Jr
Represented By: Emily L Herman-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?