Eimers v. Valmont Industries, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hannah Eimers and Stephen Eimers
Defendant: Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC, Lindsay Corporation, Valmont Industries, Inc, Valmont Highway, Barrier Systems, Inc., Armorflex International Limited and Reynolds Fence & Guardrail, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00044
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
2 Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 4/15/19. (GRE, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 4/12/2019. Arguments by counselReynolds Installer hasn't been served yet along with several other defts.Court discussed court preferences. Parties discussed discovery and trial dates.Discovery & Daubert Deadlines-Late June 2020 Trial date Nov. 9, 2020 (Court Reporter Elizabeth Coffey) (DJH, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carpenter, Brigid)
April 11, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Stephen Eimers . (Razavi, Poorad)
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Stephen Eimers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Razavi, Poorad)
April 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint [public] by Stephen Eimers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Razavi, Poorad)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The Scheduling Conference originally set for 3/14/2019 is RESET for 4/12/2019, at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 3/12/2019. (CMH)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Theodore J. Leopold on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Eimers. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leslie M. Kroeger on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Eimers. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Poorad Razavi on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Eimers. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shelby K. Riney on behalf of Lindsay Corporation, Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC., and Barrier Systems, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James H. Heller on behalf of Lindsay Corporation, Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC., and Barrier Systems. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, )
March 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Poorad Razavi ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908721.) filed by Stephen Eimers, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Leopold ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908892.) filed by Stephen Eimers, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie M. Kroeger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908878.) filed by Stephen Eimers (BJL, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Leopold ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908892.) by Stephen Eimers. (Day, Justin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie M. Kroeger ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908878.) by Stephen Eimers. (Day, Justin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Poorad Razavi ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908721.) by Stephen Eimers. (Day, Justin)
March 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James H. Heller ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908199.) filed by Lindsay Corporation, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shelby K. Riney ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908215.) filed by Lindsay Corporation (BJL, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shelby K. Riney ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908215.) by Lindsay Corporation. (Carpenter, Brigid)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James H. Heller ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3908199.) by Lindsay Corporation. (Carpenter, Brigid)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019, at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 2/22/2019. (CMH)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/22/2019. (BJL, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge R Leon Jordan no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Travis R McDonough for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/22/19. (JBR, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Lindsay Defendants ANSWER to Complaint "Plaintiff's" by Barrier Systems, Inc., Lindsay Corporation, Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC.(Carpenter, Brigid)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: theCourt concludes this case is related to previously filed case No. 1:17-cv-356- TRM-SKL, styled Stephen Eimers, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hannah Eimers v. Valmont Industries, et al. The Clerk of the Court is directed to bring this matter to the attention of the Chief United States District Judge for possible reassignment of this case to the district judge assigned to previously filed case No. 1:17-cv-356-TRM-SKL, styled Stephen Eimers, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hannah Eimers v. Valmont Industries, et al. No reassignment is needed as to the magistrate judge as it is already assigned to the correct magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/21/2019. (BJL, )*Forwarded to Chief United State Judge Varlan's chambers.
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Barrier Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lindsay Corporation for Barrier Systems, Inc.. (Carpenter, Brigid)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC (Carpenter, Brigid) Modified on 2/19/2019 (BJL,). Added Corporate Parents - Lindsay Sales Holding Co., LLC.; Lindsay Corporation to Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC Role - dft.
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lindsay Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lindsay Corporation for Lindsay Corporation. (Carpenter, Brigid) Modified on 2/19/2019 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parents - BlackRock, Inc. ; The Vanguard Group, Inc. to Lindsay Corporation Role - dft
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Barrier Systems, Inc., Lindsay Corporation, Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC. (BJL, )
February 15, 2019 District Judge R Leon Jordan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McMinn Circiut Court, case number 2019-CV-27. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3894409), filed by Lindsay Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Carpenter, Brigid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eimers v. Valmont Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Transportation Solution Sales & Services, LLC
Represented By: Brigid M Carpenter
Represented By: James H Heller
Represented By: Shelby K. Riney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Corporation
Represented By: Brigid M Carpenter
Represented By: James H Heller
Represented By: Shelby K. Riney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valmont Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valmont Highway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrier Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brigid M Carpenter
Represented By: James H Heller
Represented By: Shelby K. Riney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armorflex International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Fence & Guardrail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Eimers
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Eimers
Represented By: Adam Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Justin G. Day
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Represented By: Leslie M. Kroeger
Represented By: Poorad Razavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?