Kilgore v. Ruskey et al

Plaintiff: Cassie Kilgore
Defendant: Daniel Ruskey, Jeff Mosely and James Hutcheson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order granting Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/18/2019. (BDG, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cassie Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A)(Knight, Arthur)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Defendants. (Jenkins, Peako)
April 4, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by James Hutcheson(in his official capacity as Field Operations Lieutenant Colonel with the Tennessee Department of Safety), James Hutcheson(in his individual capacity), Jeff Mosely(in his official capacity as Captain with the Tennessee Department of Safety), Jeff Mosely(in his individual capacity), Daniel Ruskey, Daniel Ruskey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Petition for Review)(Jenkins, Peako)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by James Hutcheson(in his official capacity as Field Operations Lieutenant Colonel with the Tennessee Department of Safety), James Hutcheson(in his individual capacity), Jeff Mosely(in his official capacity as Captain with the Tennessee Department of Safety), Jeff Mosely(in his individual capacity), Daniel Ruskey, Daniel Ruskey.(Jenkins, Peako)
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Jordan on behalf of All Defendants (Jordan, Dawn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Jenkins, Peako)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss by James Hutcheson(in his official capacity as Field Operations Lieutenant Colonel with the Tennessee Department of Safety), James Hutcheson(in his individual capacity), Jeff Mosely(in his official capacity as Captain with the Tennessee Department of Safety), Jeff Mosely(in his individual capacity), Daniel Ruskey, Daniel Ruskey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Motion for Extension)(Jenkins, Peako)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by James Hutcheson(in his individual capacity), Jeff Mosely(in his individual capacity), Daniel Ruskey. (Jenkins, Peako)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Peako Andrea Jenkins on behalf of All Defendants (Jenkins, Peako)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassie Kilgore. James Hutcheson(in his official capacity as Field Operations Lieutenant Colonel with the Tennessee Department of Safety) served on 3/11/2019. (Leonard, Russell)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassie Kilgore. Jeff Mosely(in his official capacity as Captain with the Tennessee Department of Safety) served on 3/6/2019. (Leonard, Russell)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cassie Kilgore. Daniel Ruskey served on 3/6/2019. (Leonard, Russell)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Taylor Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff Cassie Kilgore. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 03/05/2019. (KRS, ) Modified on 3/6/2019 (BDG, ). Order mailed to Thomas.
March 5, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cassie Kilgore as to Cassie Kilgore. (BDG, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cassie Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Taylor Thomas)(Leonard, Russell)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Jonathan Taylor Thomas has not yet filed a Pro Hac Motion in case 1:19-cv-55. Please disregard the Clerk's previous deficiency notice (doc #10 ), and file a Pro Hac Motion in 1:19-cv-55. (CNC, ) Mailed to Jonathan Taylor Thomas.(CNC, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to James Hutcheson(in his official capacity as Field Operations Lieutenant Colonel with the Tennessee Department of Safety), Jeff Mosely(in his official capacity as Captain with the Tennessee Department of Safety), Daniel Ruskey. (BDG, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 **Disregard- entered in error.** NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Please refile with the correct case number in the style of the Motion. (CNC, ) Modified on 3/1/2019 (CNC, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT Daniel Ruskey Summons by Cassie Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Jeff Mosely Summons, #2 Supplement James Hutcheson Summons)(Leonard, Russell)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases For Trial by Cassie Kilgore. (Leonard, Russell)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/25/2019. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/25/2019. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/25/2019. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Assignment. The above-styled cases have been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes the case is related to previously filed cases No. 1:18-cv-295-HSM-SKL and 1:19-cv-45-PLR-SKL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/25/2019. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Cassie Kilgore as to Cassie Kilgore. (BDG, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cassie Kilgore. (BDG, ) Modified on 3/1/2019 (BDG, ).
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3898748.), filed by Cassie Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Daniel Ruskey, #4 Summons Jeff Mosely, #5 Summons James Hutcheson, #6 Exhibit Determination, #7 Exhibit 2017 Revision of Tennessee Dept. of Safety Towing Services Manual, #8 Exhibit Transcript, #9 Exhibit Forensic Statement, #10 Exhibit Investigation Report dated April 17, 2015, #11 Exhibit 2009 Revision of Tennessee Dept. of Safety Towing Service Manual, #12 Exhibit Letter from counsel, #13 Exhibit Letter by James Hutcheson dated November 13, 2018)(Leonard, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilgore v. Ruskey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Kilgore
Represented By: Russell L Leonard
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ruskey
Represented By: Peako Andrea Jenkins
Represented By: Dawn Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Mosely
Represented By: Peako Andrea Jenkins
Represented By: Dawn Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hutcheson
Represented By: Peako Andrea Jenkins
Represented By: Dawn Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?