Edmonds et al v. City of Chattanooga et al (JRG3)

Plaintiff: Alinda Edmonds and Dale Edmonds
Defendant: Captain Jerri Sutton, Officer Rick Van Ness, Officer Stephen Bulkley, Officer James Caleb Elliott, Officer Jason Clemons, Officer Cody Thomas and City of Chattanooga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00065
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY**** Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Stipulation : Please use the Stipulation of Dismissal event in the future. (BDG, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Stephen Bulkley(In His Individual Capacity). (Varnell, Janie)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER,Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/1/2019. (JCK)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Bulkley(In His Official Capacity), City of Chattanooga, Jason Clemons(In His Individual Capacity), Jason Clemons(In His Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Individual Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Official Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Individual Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Individual Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Official Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Official Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Individual Capacity).(Foster, Melinda)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Stephen Bulkley(In His Individual Capacity) Notice of Manual Filing (Varnell, Janie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Officer Bulkley Answer ANSWER to Complaint by Stephen Bulkley(In His Individual Capacity).(Varnell, Janie)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond by Stephen Bulkley(In His Individual Capacity), Stephen Bulkley(In His Official Capacity), City of Chattanooga, Jason Clemons(In His Individual Capacity), Jason Clemons(In His Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Individual Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Official Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Individual Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Individual Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Official Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Official Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Individual Capacity). (Foster, Melinda)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/1/2019. (BDG, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/1/2019. (BDG, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/1/2019. (BDG, )
March 1, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 19C199. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906560), filed by Jason Clemons(In His Individual Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Official Capacity), City of Chattanooga, Jason Clemons(In His Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Official Capacity), Stephen Bulkley(In His Individual Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Individual Capacity), Jerri Sutton(In Her Official Capacity), James Caleb Elliott(In His Individual Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Individual Capacity), Rick Van Ness(In His Individual Capacity), Stephen Bulkley(In His Official Capacity), Cody Thomas(In His Official Capacity). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Foster, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmonds et al v. City of Chattanooga et al (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jerri Sutton
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rick Van Ness
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stephen Bulkley
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Represented By: Janie Parks Varnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer James Caleb Elliott
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jason Clemons
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cody Thomas
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chattanooga
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alinda Edmonds
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Edmonds
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?