Welch v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (RLJ2)

Plaintiff: Steven W Welch
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Trustee: US Bank, N.A
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: R Leon Jordan
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Anne Tipps on behalf of Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, US Bank, N.A (Tipps, Jean)
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
April 18, 2019 Filing 20 Administrative Notice to Counsel #19 Notice (Other) :WRONG event used. requirements due by 4/23/2019. (BDG, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC of Filing Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Roberts, Lauren)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 4/17/19. (JBR, )
April 17, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (BDG, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Nonconsent) (BDG, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, US Bank, N.A.(Roberts, Lauren)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Roberts, Lauren)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven W Welch. US Bank, N.A served on 4/3/2019. (Flick, Brian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Reissued as to US Bank, N.A. (BDG, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended Complaint, Summons to U.S. Bank, c/o Andrew Cecere, C.E..O. by Steven W Welch. (Flick, Brian)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to US Bank, N.A. (BDG, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended Complaint, Summons for U.S. Bank by Steven W Welch. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Flick, Brian)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC., filed by Steven W Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ch. 13 Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Plan, #4 Exhibit SLS POC, #5 Exhibit TS Notice of Final Cure, #6 Exhibit TS Response to Notice of Final Cure, #7 Exhibit TS TT TFR, #8 Exhibit Mortgage Statement Copy, #9 Exhibit Bank Statements Copy, #10 Exhibit Mortgage Statement Copy)(Flick, Brian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven W Welch. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC served on 3/8/2019. (Flick, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (BDG, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Amended Summons by Steven W Welch. (Flick, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 3/4/2019. (JCK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 3/4/2019. (JCK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge R Leon Jordan on 3/4/2019. (JCK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint. Please refile completed summons with the plaintiff's attorney information included. Requirements due by 3/11/2019. (JCK)
March 4, 2019 District Judge R Leon Jordan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906728.), filed by Steven W Welch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ch. 13 Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Plan, #4 Exhibit SLS POC, #5 Exhibit TS Notice of Final Cure, #6 Exhibit TS Response to Notice of Final Cure, #7 Exhibit TS TT TFR, #8 Exhibit 030718 Mtg Stt. Copy, #9 Exhibit Bank Statements, #10 Exhibit Mortgage Statements, #11 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (RLJ2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W Welch
Represented By: Brian D Flick
Represented By: Kenneth C Rannick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Bank, N.A
Represented By: Lauren P Roberts
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?