Combs v. Capital One Financial (TV3)

Plaintiff: Christopher Kyle Combs
Defendant: capital one financial
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT (KMK, )
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: a final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, May 26, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned without a jury beginning on Tuesday, June 2, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 15, 2019. (copy mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs, 1461 Palisades Road, Signal Mountain, TN 37377) (AYB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Capital One Financial of Plaintiff's Non-Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss (Morris, Samuel) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (KMK, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (SAC, )Mailed to Combs.
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC, )Order mailed to Combs.
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss . (Morris, Samuel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial. (Morris, Samuel)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #2 Notice, #1 Notice of Removal. Informational only, for future reference when filing a corporate disclosurestatement please use the event Certificate of Corporate Interest. Also, whenfiling a civil cover sheet please file it in a non fillable format. (JCK)
March 4, 2019 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by capital one financial Corporate Disclosure Statement (Morris, Samuel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County General Sessions, case number 19GS151. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906970), filed by capital one financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. Capital One Financial (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: capital one financial
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kyle Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?