Newsome et al v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Julie Newsome and Aubrey Newsome
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc. and Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00135
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Maddux, W)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (BDG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Maddux, W)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shea W. Conley on behalf of Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome (Conley, Shea)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/6/19. (MRE)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc..(Maddux, W)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc..(Maddux, W)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua Dustin Moore on behalf of Plaintiffs Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 06/04/2019. (KRS)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shea W. Conley on behalf of Plaintiffs Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 06/04/2019. (KRS) Order mailed and emailed to Shea.
June 4, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Aubrey Newsome as to Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome (BDG)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aubrey Newsome. (Moore, Joshua)
May 30, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shea W. Conley (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Julie Newsome, Aubrey Newsome as to Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome (DJH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shea W. Conley (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt #C1016695) by Aubrey Newsome, Julie Newsome. (DJH)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants' to Respond to Amended Complaint by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Maddux, W)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Black & Decker Inc. for Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Maddux, W)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/8/19. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/8/19. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/8/19. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by All Defendants. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Joshua Dustin Moore. PHV Requirements Deadline: 5/28/19. (AWS)
May 8, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Circuit Court for Sequatchie County, case number 2019CV46. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3966032), filed by Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc., Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings)(Maddux, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsome et al v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Newsome
Represented By: Joshua Dustin Moore
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Newsome
Represented By: Joshua Dustin Moore
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black & Decker (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: W Lee Maddux
Represented By: Jacob Logan Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: W Lee Maddux
Represented By: Jacob Logan Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?