Jones v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3)

Plaintiff: Angel C. Jones
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00140
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on U.S. Attorney, OGC, Attorney General on 5/20/2019, filed by Angel C. Jones. (Osterhout, Karl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re IFP Service re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (AMP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney) (AMP)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/10/2019. (AMP)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 05/10/2019. (AMP)
May 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3968528.) filed by Angel C. Jones (ABF)
May 9, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3968528.) by Angel C. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for PA Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for WD PA, #3 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel C. Jones. (Osterhout, Karl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Angel C. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel C. Jones
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?