Bates Bend Farm, LLC v. Tennessee Valley Authority

Plaintiff: Bates Bend Farm LLC and Bates Bend Farm, LLC
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00141
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Bates Bend Farm, LLC (Horton, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bates Bend Farm, LLC. Tennessee Valley Authority served on 5/15/2019. (Horton, William)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Tennessee Valley Authority. (AML)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Bates Bend Farm, LLC. (Horton, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Bates Bend Farm, LLC. (Horton, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bates Bend Farm, LLC. (Horton, William)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/10/19. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/10/19. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/10/19. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Tennessee Valley Authority. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Bates Bend Farm, LLC. (JBR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to William Horton. Cover sheet not included. Please file a Civil Cover Sheet using the "Supplement" event. Requirements due by 5/15/2019. (JBR)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee Valley Authority ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3968684.), filed by Bates Bend Farm LLC.(Horton, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates Bend Farm, LLC v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bates Bend Farm LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bates Bend Farm, LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?