Taylor v. USA

Petitioner: Rejon Taylor
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00147
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/20/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (SAC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 32 SEALED Documents, re: #31 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, by Rejon Taylor.Main document, Doc. No. 4 Exhibit 24. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50, #10 Exhibit 51, #11 Exhibit 52, #12 Exhibit 53, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 55, #15 Exhibit 56, #16 Exhibit 57, #17 Exhibit 58, #18 Exhibit 59, #19 Exhibit 60, #20 Exhibit 61, #21 Exhibit 62, #22 Exhibit 63, #23 Exhibit 76, #24 Exhibit 77, #25 Exhibit 78, #26 Exhibit 3.27)(SAC)
May 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling and Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (SAC)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Case management conference set for August 20, 2019 at 1PM EST.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/23/2019. (SAC) Modified on 5/23/2019, Order mailed to Patricia Okonta. (SAC).
May 15, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 3.27. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 29 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 78. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 28 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 77. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 76. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 63. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 62. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 61. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 60. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 59. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 58. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 57. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 56. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 55. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 54. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 53. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 52. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 51. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 50. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 49. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 48. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 47. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 46. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 45. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 44. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 37. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 29. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor Exhibit 24. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Rejon Taylor re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),,,,,,,,,, Additional Documents In Support of Motion to Vacate, Docket Entry 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3.1 - 8/5/75 Grand Jury Charges, #2 Exhibit 3.2 - 1870 US Federal Census - Armstead Copeland, #3 Exhibit 3.3 - 1880 US Census - Armstead Copeland, #4 Exhibit 3.4 - 1900 US Census - Addie Copeland, #5 Exhibit 3.5 - 1900 US Census - Armstead Copeland, #6 Exhibit 3.6 - 1900 US Census page - Armstead C. Copeland, #7 Exhibit 3.7 - 1909 Record of Enrollment of Eastern Cherokee - Armsted Copland, #8 Exhibit 3.8 - Anna Belle Williams Benton Death Certificate, #9 Exhibit 3.9 - Bettye Taylor Eberhart Funeral Notice, #10 Exhibit 3.10 - Cecil Anderson Newspaper Clipping, #11 Exhibit 3.11 - Cecil Anderson Obituary, #12 Exhibit 3.12 - Eberhart v. State_ 257 Ga. 600, #13 Exhibit 3.13 - Eva Williams Funeral Program, #14 Exhibit 3.14 - Fifth Quarter Saloon, Inc._Johnny's business, #15 Exhibit 3.15 - Gdoc Institutional File For Johnny Taylor_Part 2, #16 Exhibit 3.16 - George Copeland (Methodist Minister)- 1880 US Census, #17 Exhibit 3.17 - Joe Gatlin's Birth Certificate, #18 Exhibit 3.18 - Johnny Taylor Central File, #19 Exhibit 3.19 - Lewis Copeland Social Secuirty application and claim, #20 Exhibit 3.20 - Marriage Certificate of Armsted Copeland and Addie Scott, #21 Exhibit 3.21 - Michael Eberhart Parole Information, #22 Exhibit 3.22 - Obituary Anna Benton, #23 Exhibit 3.23 - Paul Grant Obituary, #24 Exhibit 3.24 - Reba Birth Certificate, #25 Exhibit 3.25 - Rejon Educational Records, #26 Exhibit 3.26 - Rejon Taylor Intergenerational Health Stressors, #27 Exhibit 3.27a - Stockbridge Senior High School Transcript, #28 Exhibit 3.28 - TheAtlantaConstitution_Benton Obit, #29 Exhibit 3.29 - TheAtlantaConstitution_Shalandria Williams Obit, #30 Exhibit 3.30 - Rejon Taylor birth certificate)(Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Ex Parte by Rejon Taylor. (Henry, Kelley)
May 15, 2019 Documents related to Motion to Vacate were filed incorrectly in Criminal Case# 1:04-cr-160 on 5/14/19 and will be refilled in this case. Patricia Okonta filed a Motion for Pro Hac Vice in Criminal Case on 5/14/19 and her Motion was granted on 5/15/19. (AWS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Rejon Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- George Woods, M.D., Report, #2 Exhibit 2- Katherine Porterfield, Ph.D., Report, #3 Exhibit 4- Destiny Peery Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 5- Leslie Cory Dec, #5 Exhibit 6- Howell Clements Declaration, #6 Exhibit 7- Richard Heinsman Declaration, #7 Exhibit 8- Roy Cooper Declaration, #8 Exhibit 9- Mark D. Cunningham Declaration, #9 Exhibit 10- Marti Loring Declaration, #10 Exhibit 11- Caress Ushry Declaration, #11 Exhibit 12- Edward Joseph Gatlin Declaration, #12 Exhibit 13- Felisha Gatlin Declaration, #13 Exhibit 14- Harold Hall Declaration, #14 Exhibit 15- Jessica Jackson Langford Declaration, #15 Exhibit 16- John Taylor Declaration, #16 Exhibit 17- John Taylor II Declaration, #17 Exhibit 18- Joseph Anthony Gatlin Declaration, #18 Exhibit 19- Jovante McCoy Declaration, #19 Exhibit 20- Keashawn K Washington Declaration, #20 Exhibit 21- Lisa Taylor Griggs Declaration, #21 Exhibit 22- Nedras Moreland Declaration, #22 Exhibit 23- Nicole Gatlin Carson Declaration, #23 Exhibit 25- Precious Heflin Declaration, #24 Exhibit 26- Ramon Shepard Declaration, #25 Exhibit 27- Rashard Blackwell Declaration, #26 Exhibit 28- Rosa Moss Declaration, #27 Exhibit 30- Sandra G. Hines Declaration, #28 Exhibit 31- Sarah Harper Declaration, #29 Exhibit 32- Sylvia Stokes Declaration, #30 Exhibit 33- Tameka Shepard Declaration, #31 Exhibit 34- Tayanau Nunez Declaration, #32 Exhibit 35- Tonya Walton Declaration, #33 Exhibit 36- Traketa Taylor Declaration, #34 Exhibit 38- Vicky Holloway Dec 05 05 2019, #35 Exhibit 39- Walter Lee Taylor Declaration, #36 Exhibit 40- Warren Almand Declaration, #37 Exhibit 41- Yves Burgand-Bourgeois Declaration, #38 Exhibit 42- Heinsman Retainer, #39 Exhibit 43- Solovey Psychological Evaluation, #40 Exhibit 64- Rejon Taylor Timeline, #41 Exhibit 65- Eva Williams Death Certificate, #42 Exhibit 66- Monica Mercer - Chattanooga Sentencing delayed 09 16 08, #43 Exhibit 67- Chattanoogan - Government Says Taylor Calls Jurors Racist Re, #44 Exhibit 68- WRCB 09 16 08, #45 Exhibit 69- Ex 69 - WDEF 09 16 08a, #46 Exhibit 70- WDEF 09 16 08b, #47 Exhibit 71- WTVC News 09 16 08a, #48 Exhibit 72- WTVC 09 16 08b, #49 Exhibit 73- UPI 09 17 08 - Convicted Killers sentencing delayed, #50 Exhibit 74- Hamilton County Criminal Court Docket, #51 Exhibit 75- Fed Death Penalty Chart, #52 Exhibit 79- Collective Pleadings from Estate Dispute, #53 Exhibit 80- Batchelder Letter)(AWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Christopher D Poole
Represented By: Steven S Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rejon Taylor
Represented By: Barry J Fisher
Represented By: Amy Dawn Harwell
Represented By: Patricia N Okonta
Represented By: Kelley Jane Henry
Represented By: Henry A Martin
Represented By: Alexis Johara Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?