United States of America v. 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411
Case Number: 1:2019cv00155
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge J Ronnie Greer no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Travis R McDonough for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/5/19. (JBR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay. The United States' motion [Doc. 2] is therefore GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this civil forfeiture action, case number 1:19-cv-155, is stayed until the related criminal investigation has been concluded and any resulting criminal action has been disposed of at the trial court level, either through a verdict or by way of a plea. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States, following the entry of this Order, SHALL notify the Court of the status of the underlying criminal action at six-month intervals. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/28/2019. (JCK)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT as to Jerriod Ray Sivels, Jamaal Parker, Anthony Poindexter, Kelvin White, Deonta Banks, Lovest Carter, Darious Garrett. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign the newly filed unassigned cases, 1:19-cv-156, styled United States of America v. Real Properties Located at 617 Shannon Avenue and 508 Menlo Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 and 1:19- cv-157, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 500 Phoenix Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al. The Clerk of the Court is directed to bring this matter to the attention of the Chief United States District Judge for possible reassignment of case number 1:19-cv-155-JRG-SKL, styled United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411 to the district judge assigned to the previously filed criminal case 1:19-cr-46-TRM-SKL, styled United States of America v. Jerriod Sivels, et al and civil cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/24/19. (CNC) (CNC)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/22/19. (AWS)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/22/19. (AWS)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/22/19. (AWS)
May 22, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (AWS)
May 22, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint IN REM by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of William Wise)(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3505 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37411
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?