Steele v. G6 Hospitality LLC et al (JRG2)

Plaintiff: Michel Steele
Defendant: Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC, Michael Berry, G6 Hospitality LLC and Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by G6 Hospitality LLC, Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc., Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC.(Mann, Mary)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by All Defendants. (Mann, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michel Steele. G6 Hospitality LLC served on 6/10/2019. (Mikel, Donna)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please follow ECF 6 when filing documents. (CAT)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/07/2019. (CAT)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/07/2019. (CAT)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 06/07/2019. (CAT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Berry, G6 Hospitality LLC, Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc., Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc., #2 Summons Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC, #3 Summons Michael Berry) (CAT)
June 7, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Berry, G6 Hospitality LLC d/b/a Motel 6, Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc., Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3991721.), filed by Michel Steele. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to G5, #3 Summons Summons to JGH LLC, #4 Summons Summons to JGH Inc., #5 Summons Summons to Berry)(Mikel, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. G6 Hospitality LLC et al (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai Ganesha Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Mary J Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Berry
Represented By: Mary J Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Mary J Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai Ganesha Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Mary J Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Steele
Represented By: Donna J Mikel
Represented By: Jason J Isaacson
Represented By: Douglas S Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?