Riverport Insurance Company v. Advent Home Learning Center, Inc. et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Riverport Insurance Company
Defendant: Blondel Senior and Advent Home Learning Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00183
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties filed by Advent Home Learning Center, Inc., Blondel Senior. (Cothern, Jeremy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or to Join Necessary and Indispensable Parties by Advent Home Learning Center, Inc., Blondel Senior. (Cothern, Jeremy)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have an additional 30 days in which to file their answer. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/19/2019. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the court. (PAF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Advent Home Learning Center, Inc., Blondel Senior. (Cothern, Jeremy)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-8-19. (KMG) Served to attorney w/instruction to register.
July 3, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katharine B. Fischman filed by Riverport Insurance Company as to Riverport Insurance Company. (SAC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katharine B. Fischman by Riverport Insurance Company. (Brown, Scott)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/27/2019. (BDG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/27/2019. (BDG)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 6/27/2019. (BDG)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Katharine B Fischman is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Fischman.
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Advent Home Learning Center, Inc., Blondel Senior. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BDG)
June 25, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Riverport Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Riverport Insurance Company. (Brown, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4006751.), filed by Riverport Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2007-08 Primary Policy Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - 2007-08 Primary Policy Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - 2008-09 Primary Policy Part 1, #5 Exhibit B - 2008-09 Primary Policy Part 2, #6 Exhibit C - 2009-10 Primary Policy Part 1, #7 Exhibit C - 2009-10 Primary Policy Part 2, #8 Exhibit D - 2010-11 Primary Policy Part 1, #9 Exhibit D - 2010-11 Primary Policy Part 2, #10 Exhibit E - 2011-12 Primary Policy Part 1, #11 Exhibit E - 2011-12 Primary Policy Part 2, #12 Exhibit F - 2012-13 Primary Policy Part 1, #13 Exhibit F - 2012-13 Primary Policy Part 2, #14 Exhibit G - 2007-08 Excess Policy, #15 Exhibit H - 2008-09 Excess Policy, #16 Exhibit I - 2009-10 Excess Policy, #17 Exhibit J - 2010-11 Excess Policy, #18 Exhibit K - 2011-12 Excess Policy, #19 Exhibit L - 2012-13 Excess Policy, #20 Summons Advent Home Learning Center, Inc., #21 Summons Blondel Senior)(Brown, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riverport Insurance Company v. Advent Home Learning Center, Inc. et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blondel Senior
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Represented By: Robert Wisdom Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent Home Learning Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Cothern
Represented By: Robert Wisdom Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riverport Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott R Brown
Represented By: Katharine Beatrice Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?