Garibay v. Hamilton County, Tennessee

Plaintiff: Raul Garibay
Defendant: Hamilton County, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/21/2019. (TRT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Hobbs, R)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Hobbs, R)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION ALLOWING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND by All Defendants. (Hobbs, R)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hamill, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/24/2019. (CEA)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Nonconsent) (BDG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hamilton County, Tennessee. (Hobbs, R)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raul Garibay. Hamilton County, Tennessee served on 6/27/2019. (Hamill, Douglas)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/27/2019. (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/27/2019. (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 06/27/2019. (AMP)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hamilton County, Tennessee. (AMP)
June 27, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton County, Tennessee ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4008625.), filed by Raul Garibay. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Hamilton County, Tennessee)(Hamill, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garibay v. Hamilton County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Garibay
Represented By: Douglas S Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County, Tennessee
Represented By: R Dee Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?