Doss v. City of Graysville et al
Plaintiff: Gary L Doss
Defendant: Julie Lynn Tanksley, City of Graysville, Landon Trew and Keith Wayne Post
Case Number: 1:2019cv00188
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 2:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/23/19. (KFB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Graysville.(Wells, Ronald)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/22/19. (KFB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Keith Wayne Post(individual capacity), Julie Lynn Tanksley(individual capacity), Landon Trew(individual capacity).(Spaulding, Reid)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by City of Graysville. (Wells, Ronald)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Stipulation for Extension of Time in Which to File a Responsive Pleading by Keith Wayne Post(individual capacity), Julie Lynn Tanksley(individual capacity), Landon Trew(individual capacity). (Spaulding, Reid)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by City of Graysville, Tennessee. (Wells, Ronald)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rhea County Circuit Court, case number 2019-cv-162. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4010492), filed by City of Graysville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-Summons & Affidavit of Service-Graysville, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Summons & Affidavit of Service-Tanksley, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Summons & Affidavit of Service-Post, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E-Summons & Affidavit of Service-Trew)(Wells, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. City of Graysville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L Doss
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lynn Tanksley
Represented By: Reid A Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Graysville
Represented By: Howard L Upchurch
Represented By: Ronald D Wells
Represented By: Philip Aaron Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Trew
Represented By: Reid A Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wayne Post
Represented By: Reid A Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?