Norman v. The Village At Apison Pike
Plaintiff: Jarrett Norman
Defendant: The Village At Apison Pike
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jarrett Norman re #4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BDG)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT re #5 Order. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/11/2019. (BDG) Copy mailed to Norman and certified copy mailed to Hamilton County General Sessions Court.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. This matter is hereby REMANDED to Hamilton County General Sessions Court.Defendants motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 1) is DENIED AS MOOT. A filing fee will not be assessed against Defendant. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/11/2019. (BDG) Copy mailed to Norman and Certified copy mailed Hamilton County General Sessions Court.
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address Serviced via US Mail to Jarrett Norman.(KFB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for removal and Federal Stay of eviction re #2 Notice of Removal by Jarrett Norman. (KFB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County, TN, case number 19gs7259, filed by Jarrett Norman. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Hamilton Co)(KFB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarrett Norman. (KFB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. The Village At Apison Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village At Apison Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarrett Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?