Gibbs v. State of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr.
Defendant: Chattanooga Police Department, State of Tennessee, C.C.A.'s Well Path Medical, Correct Care Solutions, Officer Ryan Lynn, Hamilton County Jail, Hamilton County, Hamilton County Jail Medical, C.C.A. Employees, Robert DeBusk and Civic Core of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00202
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT ORDER. This pro se civil rights action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) J/O mailed to Michael Gibbs
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. The instant action is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's inability to pay the filing fee in full and thereby reinstate this case. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/29/2019. (AML) M/O mailed to Michael Gibbs
August 27, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Original Complaint by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Michael T. Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AML) Requested forms mailed to Michael Gibbs.
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(BDG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Michael Terrel Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (BDG)
June 21, 2019 An email has been sent to US Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee's Chambers for determination as to whether this case is related to 1:17-cv-00004-JRG-SKL Gibbs et al v. State of Tennessee et al (JRG2) and 4:13-cv-00045-HSM-SKL Gibbs v. State of Tennessee et al and other miscellaneous cases (1:19-mc-9 through 1:19-mc-16)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BDG)Notice mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr.
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (IFP) - The Court is in receipt of your complaint/petition. However, in order for this matter to proceed, you must either pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. (BJL)*Mailed to Michael Terrell Gibbs, along with an IFP Application and Certificate of Inmate Accounts.
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope) (BJL)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Amend/Revise by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(BJL)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Certificates of Inmate Account by Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. State of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.A.'s Well Path Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ryan Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Jail Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.A. Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert DeBusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civic Core of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Terrell Gibbs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?