West v. Lincoln Financial Group
Plaintiff: Richard West
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group and Lincoln Financial Group Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00203
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant, Lincoln Financial Group Company d/b/a Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, shall have up to and including September 13, 2019, within which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-23-19.This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (KMG)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 2/24/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/23/2019. (AML)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lincoln Financial Group Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(McKnight, Anne)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne T McKnight on behalf of Lincoln Financial Group Company (McKnight, Anne)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln Financial Group Company served on 7/19/2019. (AML)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/12/2019. (BJL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/12/2019. (BJL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/12/2019. (BJL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re: Attachments 1 and 2 to the Complaint-INFORMATIONAL ONLY. (BJL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Financial Group Company via Commissioner of the Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Financial Group ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4020123.), filed by Richard West. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunlap, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Lincoln Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard West
Represented By: John E Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Financial Group Company
Represented By: Anne T McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?