Lemeh v. Ditto et al (DCLC3)
Appellant: Eva M Lemeh and REO Holdings, LLC
Appellee: Chattanooga Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc, Cherilyn Etta Bryant, Carlton J Ditto and Hamilton County Delinquent Tax Attorney
Interested Party: Appeal Rucker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00206
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
2 Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's BRIEF by REO Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Charles)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Transmittal of Record on Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal, #2Record on Appeal)(BDG)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. District Judge Thomas A Varlan no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to District Judge Clifton L Corker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/8/2019. (RET)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-19. (KMG) Order mailed and emailed to Walker.
August 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by REO Holdings, LLC as to REO Holdings, LLC, REO Holdings, LLC (BDG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016844) by REO Holdings, LLC, REO Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order)(BDG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice to Counsel:Attorney Walker and Glascock not registered for CM/ECF, Please register for CMECF. requirements due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other)(BDG)Notice mailed to Walker and Glascock.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/16/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Carlton J Ditto, Charles E Walker, and William Pryor Glascock, Jr.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/16/2019. (BDG)Order mailed Carlton J Ditto, Charles E Walker, and William Pryor Glascock, Jr.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/16/2019. (BDG) Notice mailed to Carlton J Ditto, Charles E Walker, and William Pryor Glascock, Jr.
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice from USDC to all counsel regarding Bankruptcy Rule 8018(a) briefing. (BDG)Notice mailed to Carlton J Ditto, Charles E Walker, and William Pryor Glascock, Jr.
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:16-BK-03349 M.D. TN. and Adversary Proceeding 1:16-ap-1036, filed by REO Holdings, LLC. Appeal Record due by 8/30/2019.(BDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemeh v. Ditto et al (DCLC3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eva M Lemeh
Represented By: Robert William Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: REO Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Charles E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chattanooga Neighborhood Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Harry R Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cherilyn Etta Bryant
Represented By: William Pryor Glascock, Jr
Represented By: William T Bible, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carlton J Ditto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hamilton County Delinquent Tax Attorney
Represented By: James C Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Appeal Rucker
Represented By: Appeal Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?