Winston et al v. Zaehringer, et al. (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Thomas C Winston and Sue M Winston
Defendant: Perfomance Arbitrage, Life Funding Options, Richard Zaehringer, Annuity FYI, Financial Products Distributors, And Gamber, David Woodard, Upstate Law Group, LCC, SoBell Ridge Corp, Andrew Gamber, Kate Synder, Candy Kern-Fuller and Michelle Plant
Case Number: 1:2019cv00216
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Zaehringer(agent for Annuity FYI). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Spitler, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard Zaehringer(agent for Annuity FYI). (Spitler, Brian)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Annuity FYI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Shaughnessy, #2 Exhibit A - Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit B - Lead Form)(Etchells, Kelly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Annuity FYI. (Etchells, Kelly)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants., filed by Sue M Winston(Individually), Thomas C Winston(Individually), Thomas C Winston(owner of the Thomas Winston IRA R100610337), Sue M Winston(owner of the Sue Winston IRA R1000610340).(Veach, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 Administrative Notice to Counsel #16 Amended Document : Wrong Event Used requirements due by 9/16/2019. (BDG)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sue M Winston(Individually), Sue M Winston(owner of the Sue Winston IRA R1000610340), Thomas C Winston(Individually), Thomas C Winston(owner of the Thomas Winston IRA R100610337). . (Veach, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 unopposed Third Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall electronically file within seven days of entry of this Order the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-30-19. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. (KMG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Third MOTION to Amend/Revise by Sue M Winston(Individually), Sue M Winston(owner of the Sue Winston IRA R1000610340), Thomas C Winston(Individually), Thomas C Winston(owner of the Thomas Winston IRA R100610337). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Other, #3 Other)(Veach, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against All Defendants., filed by Thomas C Winston(Individually), Sue M Winston(owner of the Sue Winston IRA R1000610340).(Veach, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey William Maddux on behalf of Annuity FYI (Maddux, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Annuity FYI. (Etchells, Kelly)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC. (Wingo, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Wingo on behalf of Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC (Wingo, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Stipulation Extending Defendant Richard Zehringer's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursurant to Local Rule 12.1(a) by Richard Zaehringer(agent for Annuity FYI). (Spitler, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-25-19. (KMG) Modified on 7/26/2019 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to Sutter.
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Upstate Law Group, LCC. (BDG)Notice mailed to Sutter.
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, John B Veach, III is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Veach. Modified on 7/24/2019 (BDG).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/24/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Sutter.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/24/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Sutter.
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/24/2019. (BDG) Order mailed to Sutter.
July 24, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC as to Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC (BDG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number c1016829) by Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BDG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 19C669. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number c1016829), filed by Candy Kern-Fuller, Upstate Law Group, LCC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(BDG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston et al v. Zaehringer, et al. (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfomance Arbitrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Funding Options
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Zaehringer
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annuity FYI
Represented By: Jeffrey William Maddux
Represented By: Kelly Blair Etchells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Products Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upstate Law Group, LCC
Represented By: Howard E Sutter, III
Represented By: John R Wingo
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoBell Ridge Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Gamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Synder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candy Kern-Fuller
Represented By: Howard E Sutter, III
Represented By: John R Wingo
Represented By: Jean Anne Tipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Winston
Represented By: John B Veach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue M Winston
Represented By: John B Veach, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?