Post et al v. Hampton et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Christian Heatherly and Paige Post
Defendant: McMinn county, Deputy Lieutenant Tony Parsons, Sheriff Joe Guy, Deputy Boo Alan Hampton, Deputy Matthew Williams, Deputy McKenzie Miller, Deputy Charles Haney, Joe Guy, Boo Alan Hampton, Charles Haney, Tony Parsons, McKenzie Miller, Matthew Williams and McMinn County, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00232
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Paige Post.(Dupree, Charles)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Boo Alan Hampton (Michel, Alix)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by McMinn County, Tennessee re #4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss That the Parties Are Conferring (Michel, Alix)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Charles Haney (Michel, Alix)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Matthew Williams (Michel, Alix)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of McKenzie Miller (Michel, Alix)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Charles Haney served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Tony Parsons served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Joe Guy served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Matthew Williams served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. McKenzie Miller served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Boo Alan Hampton served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #11 Subpoena Returned Executed filed incorrectly : requirements due by 9/23/2019. (AML)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Boo Hampton on 9/4/19 (Attachments: #1 Summons return of service for Hampton, #2 Summons return of service for miller, #3 Summons return of service for Haney, #4 Summons return of service for Williams, #5 Summons return of service for Guy, #6 Summons return of service for Parsons)(Dupree, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Joe Guy (Michel, Alix)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of McMinn County, Tennessee (Michel, Alix)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Boo Alan Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Charles Haney, #2 Summons Issued as to Joe Guy, #3 Summons Issued as to Matthew Williams, #4 Summons Issued as to McKenzie Miller, #5 Summons Issued as to McMinn County, #6 Summons Issued as to Toby Parsons)(AML)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #6 Supplement : Informational for future filings. (AML)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Paige Post. (Attachments: #1 Summons McMinn County Summons, #2 Summons Guy summons, #3 Summons Hampton summons, #4 Summons haney summons, #5 Summons Miller summons, #6 Summons Parsons summons, #7 Summons williams summons)(Dupree, Charles)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Charles Dupree re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 8/26/2019. (AWS)
August 19, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4051965.), filed by Paige Post. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Hampton summons, #3 Summons Miller summons, #4 Summons Williams summons, #5 Summons Haney Summons, #6 Summons Parsons summons, #7 Summons Guy Sunmmons, #8 Summons McMinn County Summons)(Dupree, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post et al v. Hampton et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Heatherly
Represented By: Charles P Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Post
Represented By: Charles P Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMinn county
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Lieutenant Tony Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joe Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Boo Alan Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy McKenzie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Charles Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Guy
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boo Alan Hampton
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Haney
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenzie Miller
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Williams
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMinn County, Tennessee
Represented By: David J Ward
Represented By: Alix Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?