ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC et al v. Tullberg et al (PLR1)
Plaintiff: ARCpoint Holdings, LLC and ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC
Defendant: Bob Tullberg, Med Testing Services, Inc., d/b/a "ARCpoint," "ARCpoint Labs," "ARCpoint Services," and "ADL Testing" and Med Testing Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Stay. The Courts September 30, 2019 Scheduling Order and the underlying litigation are STAYED. If the settlement discussions do not resolve the underlying litigation, the parties are DIRECTED to filea motion to set aside the stay and will thereafter comply with the Courts Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/17/19. (ABF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Stay PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS [proposed order submitted] by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 4/6/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/30/19. (ABF)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Med Testing Services, Inc.. (Barham, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Med Testing Services, Inc., Bob Tullberg.(Barham, Stephen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Verified Complaint by Med Testing Services, Inc., Bob Tullberg. (Barham, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST FOR HEARING by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anne P. Caiola on behalf of ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 09/05/2019. (KRS) Served to Anne Caiola with instruction to register.
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James W. Faris on behalf of ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 09/05/2019. (KRS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. Med Testing Services, Inc. served on 9/3/2019. (Collins, K.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. Bob Tullberg served on 9/3/2019. (Collins, K.)
August 30, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James W. Faris) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4066472.) filed by ARCpoint Holdings, LLC, ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Anne P. Caiola) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4066473.) filed by ARCpoint Holdings, LLC, ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC (AML)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Anne P. Caiola) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4066473.) by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (James W. Faris) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4066472.) by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/26/19. (AWS) Mailed to Anne Caiola.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/26/19. (AWS) Mailed to Anne Caiola.
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 3,881,304; 3,881,303; 4,266,805; 4,304,236 . (Collins, K.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/26/19. (AWS) Mailed to Anne Caiola.
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Med Testing Services)(AWS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Anne Caiola & James W. Faris re #1 Complaint. (AWS) Mailed to Anne Caiola.
August 26, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (Collins, K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Decl. of Anne Caiola, #2 Other Decl. of Felix Mirando, #3 Other Decl. of Ed Coffey, #4 Other Decl. of James Faris, #5 Other Decl. of Randall Tucker)(Collins, K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST FOR HEARING by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Collins, K.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Med Testing Services, Inc., d/b/a "ARCpoint," "ARCpoint Labs," "ARCpoint Services," and "ADL Testing", Bob Tullberg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4059971.), filed by ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC, ARCpoint Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Franchise Agreement and Non-Compete, #2 Exhibit B- Change Our Name E-Mail, #3 Exhibit C- Vendor Email, #4 Exhibit D- June 24 Letter, #5 Exhibit E- Investigator Photos, #6 Exhibit F- Coffey Photos, #7 Exhibit G- Facebook, #8 Exhibit H- Linkedin, #9 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet, #10 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Summons Bob Tullberg, #12 Summons Med Testing)(Collins, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC et al v. Tullberg et al (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCpoint Holdings, LLC
Represented By: K. Chris Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCpoint Franchise Group, LLC
Represented By: K. Chris Collins
Represented By: Anne P Caiola
Represented By: James W. Faris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Tullberg
Represented By: Jeffrey William Maddux
Represented By: Stephen D Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Testing Services, Inc., d/b/a "ARCpoint," "ARCpoint Labs," "ARCpoint Services," and "ADL Testing"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Testing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey William Maddux
Represented By: Stephen D Barham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?