Buckner v. Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. et al (JRG3)
Plaintiff: Shannon Wayne Buckner
Defendant: Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. and Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 1:2019cv00244
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc..(Fonnesbeck, Shana)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants., filed by Shannon Wayne Buckner.(Ward, Joshua)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint and Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 400 - Greeneville before District Judge J Ronnie Greer. The expected length of trial is four (4) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 9:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2020. Utilization of Mediation due by 6/9/2020. Status Report due by 4/7/2020. See Order for additional dates and details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/04/2019. (AMP)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Amend/Revise Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint by Shannon Wayne Buckner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Ward, Joshua)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fonnesbeck, Shana)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED:1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/17/2019. (JCK)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Shannon Wayne Buckner (Ward, Joshua)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey S. Hiller on behalf of Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 09/10/2019. (KRS) Modified on 9/11/2019 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Hiller.
September 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey S. Hiller) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4073044.) filed by Peyton's Southeastern, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I (BJL)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey S. Hiller) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4073044.) by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Hiller)(Fonnesbeck, Shana)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc..(Fonnesbeck, Shana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.. (Fonnesbeck, Shana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Kroger Limited Partnership I identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Fonnesbeck, Shana)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/26/2019. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/26/2019. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/26/2019. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley County Chancery Court, case number 2019-cv-276. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4061535), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I, Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Fonnesbeck, Shana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. Peyton's Southeastern, Inc. et al (JRG3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton's Southeastern, Inc.
Represented By: Shana G Fonnesbeck
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Shana G Fonnesbeck
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Wayne Buckner
Represented By: Robert Ethan Hargraves
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?