Krystal Company, The et al v. Portland Burgers, LLC et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Krystal Trademark Company, Krystal Company, The and The Krystal Company
Defendant: Lafayette Burgers, LLC, Stephen Roberson and Portland Burgers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas A. Pacheco on behalf of Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 10/30/2019. (KRS) Modified on 10/31/2019 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to Pacheco.
October 29, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thomas A. Pacheco) filed by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company as to Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (BDG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thomas A. Pacheco) by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (Lunn, Samantha)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company re #17 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), (Lunn, Samantha)
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons in a Civil Action (Lafayette Burgers, LLC) by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Portland Burgers, LLC, #2 Summons Stephen Roberson)(Lunn, Samantha)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Thomas Pacheco is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG)Notice mailed to Pacheco.
October 7, 2019 PHV Docket Text Order as to Attorney Eric L. Yaffe (doc. 16) mailed to Eric L. Yaffe (GRE)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric L. Yaffe on behalf of Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 10/04/2019. (KRS)
October 1, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric L. Yaffe ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091862.) filed by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company as to Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company (BDG)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric L. Yaffe ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4091862.) by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (Lunn, Samantha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company re #10 Certificate of Corporate Interest, #11 Certificate of Corporate Interest Notice of Service (Lunn, Samantha)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Administrative Notice to Counsel #10 Certificate of Corporate Interest, #11 Certificate of Corporate Interest : requirements due by 9/24/2019. (BDG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Allen Burgett on behalf of Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company (Burgett, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Krystal Trademark Company identifying Corporate Parent Argonne Capital Group for Krystal Trademark Company. (Lunn, Samantha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Krystal Company identifying Corporate Parent Argonne Capital Group for The Krystal Company. (Lunn, Samantha)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Corrected Cover Sheet by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (Lunn, Samantha)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/17/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Eric Yaffee and Thomas Pacheco) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/17/2019. (Copy of mailed to Eric Yaffe and Thomas Pacheco) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 09/17/2019. (Copy of Order mailed Thomas Pacheco, Eric Yaffe) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Lafayette Burgers, LLC, Portland Burgers, LLC, Stephen Roberson. (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorneys are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Thomas Pacheco, and Eric Yaffe) (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Patent and Trademark Notice : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference, please be sure to file the Patent and Trademark Notice in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint :Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format with the correct date using the event "Supplement" found under category "Other Documents" and then link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 9/23/2019. (CAT)
September 17, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Krystal Trademark Company, The Krystal Company. (CAT)
September 17, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 1,330,234; 1,330,251; and 1,331,146 . (Lunn, Samantha)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4079808.), filed by Krystal Company, The, Krystal Trademark Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Lunn, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krystal Company, The et al v. Portland Burgers, LLC et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Trademark Company
Represented By: Samantha A Lunn
Represented By: Eric L Yaffe
Represented By: Ryan Allen Burgett
Represented By: Thomas A Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Company, The
Represented By: Samantha A Lunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Krystal Company
Represented By: Samantha A Lunn
Represented By: Eric L Yaffe
Represented By: Thomas A Pacheco
Represented By: Ryan Allen Burgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette Burgers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Burgers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?