Chen v. Komatsu America Corp.
Plaintiff: Gang Chen
Defendant: Komatsu America Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : The parties have filed a Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting [Doc. 13]. Therefore, a telephonic scheduling conference is set for Wednesday, December 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. EST. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate a conference call with counsel for Defendant after which all participating counsel shall call chambers at (423) 787-7400 at the appointed time. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/22/2019. (CAT)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Daniell, Grace)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by Plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/25/2019. (AMP)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Gang Chen (Daniell, Grace)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Komatsu America Corp..(Ricci, Mallory)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Jointly Filed Dismissing Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Komatsu America Corp.. (Ricci, Mallory)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and Defendant shall have an extension until October 11, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Komatsu America Corp.. (Ricci, Mallory)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Komatsu America Corp.. (Ricci, Mallory)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Komatsu America Corp.. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/24/2019. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (SAC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 19C942. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4086964), filed by Komatsu America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Sara Francis, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Ricci, Mallory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. Komatsu America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gang Chen
Represented By: Grace E Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komatsu America Corp.
Represented By: Teresa R Bult
Represented By: Mallory Schneider Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?