Shuford v. Johnson & Johnson et al (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Tammie D. Shuford
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00279
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc.. (DJH)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Request for issuance of new Ethicon summons by Tammie D. Shuford. (Bilbo, Jimmy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tammie D. Shuford Alias Summons to Ethicon, Inc. (Bilbo, Jimmy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Ethicon, Inc. on 10/17/2019 (Bilbo, Jimmy)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/02/2019. (AMP)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/02/2019. (AMP)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/02/2019. (AMP)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Johnson & Johnson) (AMP)
October 2, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4093920.), filed by Tammie D. Shuford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Bilbo, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shuford v. Johnson & Johnson et al (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie D. Shuford
Represented By: Jimmy W Bilbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?