Walden v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Anthony Dayne Walden
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00288
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 11/24/2019. (CNC)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re IFP Service (CNC)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. (CNC) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct docket text (CNC).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/28/19. (CNC)
October 24, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint - SSA Summons by Anthony Dayne Walden. (Meeks, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Dayne Walden. (Meeks, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Anthony Dayne Walden, filed by Anthony Dayne Walden. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Indigency)(Meeks, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dayne Walden
Represented By: Robert N. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?